This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:59:01 (UTC).

Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Uniloc 2017 LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05342

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Uniloc 2017 LLC

Petitioners

Uniloc Licensing USA LLC

Uniloc USA, Inc.

Defendant

Google LLC

Not Classified By Court

David Keyzer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

James L Etheridge

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 E Southlake Blvd, Ste 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brett Aaron Mangrum

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Jeffrey Huang

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Travis Lee Richins

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Brian Matthew Koide

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 E. Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Aaron Seth Jacobs

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place, Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Kevin Gannon

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye

One International Place, Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Ryan Scott Loveless

Attorney at Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

2600 East Southlake Blvd, Suite 120-324

Southlake, TX 76092

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Joseph Samartino

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP - Chicago

70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60602-4231

Masanori Koresawa

Attorney at Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Paul Isaac Margulies

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP - Wash DC

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

David A Caine

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP - Palo Alto

1801 Page Mill Road, Suite 110

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Carson Dean Anderson

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

5 Palo Alto Square, Suite 500, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

E. Glenn Thames, Jr.

Attorney at Potter Minton, P.C.

500 Plaza Tower, 110 N. College

Tyler, TX 75702

Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500, Po Box 359

Tyler, TX 75710-0359

Michael Anthony Berta

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP - San Francisco

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Patrick Conor Reidy

Attorney at Arnold Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Nicholas Momti Nyemah

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP - Wash DC

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Nicholas Lee

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael Edwin Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#203

201 #8

Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 254

201 #5

Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 216

201 #3

Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 205

201 #2

Appendix 2

201 #1

Appendix 1

#201

#329

#202

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - '201 Patent

#1

666 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2020. Supplemental Brief re Motion to Dismiss due by 10/9/2020. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Reply due by 10/23/2020. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to be held via Zoom.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes as to each individual case: 57 minutes total for all related cases. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#204) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AS TO THE Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 9/21/2020 01:00 PM in these related cases. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinars (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666International numbers available: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/u/advFLxrTkxGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 01:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) EXHIBITS re #201 Joint Case Management Statement, (Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 248) filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. No caption Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a caption page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page require ment and re-file document in its entirety with a caption page. Re: #202 Exhibits filed by Google LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) EXHIBITS re #201 Joint Case Management Statement, (Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 248) filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC and Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 205, #4 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 209, #5 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 216, #6 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 218, #7 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 253, #8 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 254)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) ORDER GRANTING MOTION PRO HAC VICE AS TO ANDREW T. DUFRESNE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers : in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (181) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (296) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (183) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (183) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (194) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF POTTER MINTON P.C. by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting (310) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (278) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05340-YGR; granting (190) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (178) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (178) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (187) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Richins, Travis) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Huang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 12/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT of Patent Infringement against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7078867.), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '201 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Uniloc USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc Licensing USA, LLC is a litigant