This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2020 at 12:11:55 (UTC).

Uniloc 2017 LLC et al v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Uniloc 2017 LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04355

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Uniloc 2017 LLC

Uniloc USA, Inc.

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

Uniloc USA, Inc.

Talbot Harty

Uniloc Licensing USA LLC

Matthew Kowalec

Defendant

Google LLC

Not Classified By Court

David Keyzer

Scott Woloson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Vella

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

357 S Coast Hwy, Unit 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Aaron Seth Jacobs

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place, Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

David Adam Caine

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Five Palo Alto Square, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94304-3807

Masanori Koresawa

Attorney at Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael A. Berta

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Duy Khiem Nguyen

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Five Palo Alto Square, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306-3806

Carson Dean Anderson

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

5 Palo Alto Square, Suite 500, 3000 El Camino Real

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Nicholas H Lee

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-5844

Bonnie Phan

Attorney at Arnold Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

3000 El Camino Real, Five Palo Alto Square, Suite 500

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Andrew T. Dufresne

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

33 East Main Street, Suite 201

Madison, WI 53703

Dan L Bagatell

3 Weatherby Road

Hanover, NH 03755-1923

 

Court Documents

#347

(#347) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #341 Motion to Withdraw as to attorney Brian Koide. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#346

(#346) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

345 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#345

(#345) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14844783.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dufresne, Andrew) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#344

(#344) NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Levi Bagatell (Bagatell, Dan) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#343

(#343) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #339 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to the Etheridge Law Group, PLLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

341 #1

Proposed Order

#341

(#341) MOTION to Withdraw BRIAN KOIDE filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2020. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#339

(#339) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ETHERIDGE LAW GROUP, PLLC filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2020. Replies due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/2018. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8949954

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7029901.), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8949954, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/17/2018)

824 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#347) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #341 Motion to Withdraw as to attorney Brian Koide. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#346) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#345) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14844783.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dufresne, Andrew) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#344) NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Levi Bagatell (Bagatell, Dan) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#343) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #339 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to the Etheridge Law Group, PLLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #337 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to the Potter Minton PC firm.. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#341) MOTION to Withdraw BRIAN KOIDE filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2020. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/14/2020) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#340) Certificate of Interested Entities by Uniloc 2017 LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF Uniloc Holdings LLC for Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#339) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ETHERIDGE LAW GROUP, PLLC filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2020. Replies due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#338) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASES. The Court SETs a case management conference for all parties for Monday, September 21, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. PDT. A case management statement is due Monday, September 14, 2020. The Court requests that the parties file one comprehensive statement for all of the Uniloc cases, and include a chart with the proposed dates showing where there is agreement versus disagreement. The Case Management Conference will be held via the Court's Zoom Platform.The Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
358 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Huang, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mangrum, Brett) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/2018. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7029901.), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8949954, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Uniloc USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc Licensing USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant