This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2022 at 18:13:55 (UTC).

Uniformed Fire Officers Association et al v. DeBlasio et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Uniformed Fire Officers Association filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DeBlasio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05441

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York

Captains Endowment Association

Uniformed Fire Officers Association

Detectives' Endowment Association

Sergeants Benevolent Association

Defendants

Civilian Complaint Review Board

New York City Police Department

Fire Department of the City of New York

Frederick Davie

Daniel A. Nigro

Dermot F. Shea

CITY OF NEW YORK

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorneys

Anthony Paul Coles

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Michael Robert Hepworth

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorney

Rebecca Gibson Quinn

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Other Attorneys

John Spencer Cusick

Attorney at Naacp Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.

40 Rector Street, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Molly Griffard

Attorney at The Legal Aid Society

199 Water Street, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 11216

Kami Zumbach Barker

Attorney at NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Samir Deger-Sen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Joel David Bertocchi

Attorney at Akerman LLP

71 South Wacker Drive, Ste 47Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Alex V. Chachkes

Attorney at Setty Chachkes PLLC

228 Park Ave S, Ste 54517

New York, NY 10003-1502

Kayla Marie Rooney

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Brian S. Fraser

Attorney at Akerman LLP

520 Madison Avenue, Ste 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Joseph Myer Sanderson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jamie Lynne Wine

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Chris Hollinger

Attorney at O'Melveny & Meyers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-3823

Dominique F. Saint-Fort

Attorney at New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Margaret Lee Wheeler-Frothingham

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Molly Knopp Biklen

Attorney at New York Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad St.

New York, NY 10004

Michael Sisitzky

Attorney at New York Civil Liberties Union

1 Whitehall St Fl 3

New York, NY 10004

Jeremy F Wood

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

600 University St., Suite 3200

Seattle, WA 98101

Ye Eun E Chun

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton

One Liberty Plaza, 34 Floor

New York, NY 10006

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#206

#199

#197

#115

#97

#95

#73

#67

#64

#261

(#261) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Communities United for Police Reform, Frederick Davie, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Correction, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro, Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Captains Endowment Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#260

(#260) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Carey Sikes on behalf of Communities United for Police Reform..(Sikes, Caitlin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#259

(#259) MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on #258 LETTER RESPONSE; granting #257 Letter Motion for Conference re: #257 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the letter motion from Intervenor Communities United for Police Reform ("CPR") requesting a premotion conference regarding its anticipated Motion to Modify the Injunction (Dkt. #257), as well as Defendants' above response (Dkt. #258). Plaintiffs declined to submit a responsive letter. CPR's request for a conference is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a telephonic conference on April 13, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. At the specified date and time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533#. Please note, the conference line will not be available before 12:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 257. Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/29/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#258

(#258) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Dominique F. Saint-Fort and Kami Barker dated March 22, 2021 re: #257 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. . Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Correction, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro, Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio..(Saint-Fort, Dominique) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#257

(#257) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. Document filed by Communities United for Police Reform..(Phillips, Renee) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#256

(#256) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Communities United for Police Reform, #200 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, Captains Endowment Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association. USCA Case Number 20-2789-cv(L); 20-3177-cv(Xap). UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the order of the District Court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 3/9/2021..(nd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#255

(#255) ORDER granting #253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Chachkes as counsel of record for Intervenor-Defendant Communities United for Police Reform. Attorney Alex V. Chachkes terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/27/2021) (nb) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#254

No Description Available

253 #1

Certificate of Service

418 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines (km) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#261) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Communities United for Police Reform, Frederick Davie, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Correction, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro, Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Captains Endowment Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE ADJOURNING CONFERENCE re: #259 Order on Motion for Conference: The conference scheduled for today, 4/13/2021, is adjourned sine die. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#260) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Carey Sikes on behalf of Communities United for Police Reform..(Sikes, Caitlin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#259) MEMO ENDORSED ORDER on #258 LETTER RESPONSE; granting #257 Letter Motion for Conference re: #257 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the letter motion from Intervenor Communities United for Police Reform ("CPR") requesting a premotion conference regarding its anticipated Motion to Modify the Injunction (Dkt. #257), as well as Defendants' above response (Dkt. #258). Plaintiffs declined to submit a responsive letter. CPR's request for a conference is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a telephonic conference on April 13, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. At the specified date and time, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533#. Please note, the conference line will not be available before 12:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 257. Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/29/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#258) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Dominique F. Saint-Fort and Kami Barker dated March 22, 2021 re: #257 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. . Document filed by Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department of Correction, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro, Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio..(Saint-Fort, Dominique) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#257) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: anticipated Motion to Modify the Preliminary Injunction addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Renee Phillips dated 3/17/2021. Document filed by Communities United for Police Reform..(Phillips, Renee) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: #256 USCA Mandate,,,..(nd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#256) MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #225 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Communities United for Police Reform, #200 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,, filed by Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, Captains Endowment Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association. USCA Case Number 20-2789-cv(L); 20-3177-cv(Xap). UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the order of the District Court is AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 3/9/2021..(nd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#255) ORDER granting #253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Chachkes as counsel of record for Intervenor-Defendant Communities United for Police Reform. Attorney Alex V. Chachkes terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/27/2021) (nb) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
289 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rebecca Gibson Quinn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sergeants Benevolent Association of the City of New York; Uniformed Fire Officers Association; Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York; Police Benevolent Association; Correction Officers Benevolent Association, Inc.; Lieutenants Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.;Captains Endowment Association; Detectives Endowment Association of New York City; Bill DeBlasio;CITY OF NEW YORK; Fire Department of the City of New York; Daniel A. Nigro; New York City Department Of Corrections; N.Y.C. D.O.C. Comm. Cynthia Brann; Dermot F. Shea; New York City Police Department; Frederick Davie; Civilian Complaint Review Board. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Rebecca Gibson Quinn. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Captains Endowment Association. The party was added to the case in error. (jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Gibson Quinn. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 154982/2020E..Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Police Department, Frederick Davie, Dermot F. Shea, Daniel A. Nigro, Fire Department of the City of New York, Cynthia Brann, New York City Department Of Corrections, Bill DeBlasio, Civilian Complaint Review Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Quinn, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rebecca Gibson Quinn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the incorrect party role was listed for Plaintiffs on the PDF case caption. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/21/2020. (jgo) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominique F. Saint-Fort on behalf of Cynthia Brann, CITY OF NEW YORK, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Bill DeBlasio, Fire Department of the City of New York, New York City Department Of Corrections, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro, Dermot F. Shea..(Saint-Fort, Dominique) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of of Entry of State Court Order re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers Benevolent Association, Inc., Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, Lieutenants Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Police Benevolent Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York..(Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Paul Coles on behalf of Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers Benevolent Association, Inc., Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, Lieutenants Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Police Benevolent Association, Sergeants Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Uniformed Fire Officers Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York..(Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 154882/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20694801).Document filed by CITY OF NEW YORK, New York City Police Department, Frederick Davie, Dermot F. Shea, Daniel A. Nigro, Fire Department of the City of New York, Cynthia Brann, New York City Department Of Corrections, Bill DeBlasio, Civilian Complaint Review Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint).(Quinn, Rebecca) Modified on 7/16/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Uniformed Fire Officers Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Civilian Complaint Review Board is a litigant

Latest cases where Detectives' Endowment Association is a litigant