This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2021 at 07:59:50 (UTC).

UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A. v. SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S A filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Leda D. Wettre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06457

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.

Respondent

SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARGARET SCOOLIDGE

Respondent Attorney

AURORA CASSIRER

 

Court Documents

10 #18

Certificate of Service

10 #17

Text of Proposed Order

10 #16

Brief Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Petitioner Unicobas Motion to Confirm A

10 #15

Exhibit (5) November 3, 2014 Email from A. Maldonado

10 #14

Exhibit (4) November 2014 QBR Report

10 #13

Exhibit (3) Payments Worksheet - Nov.2014

10 #12

Exhibit (2) A-R Register Report

10 #11

Exhibit (1) Exclusive Manufacturing Agreement

10 #10

Affidavit of Sammy Saka

10 #9

Exhibit (H) Neal v. Asta Funding, Inc., 2013 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 170801 (D.N.J. Dec

10 #8

Exhibit (G) Kings Choice Neckwear, Inc. v. FedEx Corp., 2007 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 93

10 #7

Exhibit (F) Anhui Provincial Import & Export Corp. v. Hart Enters. Intl, 1996 U.

10 #2

Exhibit (A) AMCHAM Brasil Arbitration and Mediation Rules

#10

3 #3

Text of Proposed Judgment

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Brief

#3

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #10 Cross MOTION to Vacate #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award or Alternatively, to Stay this Proceeding and in Opposition to Petitioner Unicoba's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award, #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion reset for 6/21/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the deadline by which Respondent must reply to Petitioner's Reply and Opposition is June 14, 2021; that the motion return date be adjourned to June 21, 2021, or as soon thereafter on a date and time to be established by the Court.. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 5/7/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for briefing schedule and adjournment of motion date by UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.. (SCOOLIDGE, MARGARET) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #10 Cross MOTION to Vacate #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award or Alternatively, to Stay this Proceeding and in Opposition to Petitioner Unicoba's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Cross MOTION to Vacate #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award or Alternatively, to Stay this Proceeding and in Opposition to Petitioner Unicoba's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aurora Cassirer, Esq, #2 Exhibit (A) AMCHAM Brasil Arbitration and Mediation Rules, #3 Exhibit (B) Brazilian Filing, #4 Exhibit (C) EGI-VSR, LLC v. Huber, 2020 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 54405 (S.D.N.Y. Mar. 27, 2020)., #5 Exhibit (D) Vargas-Rodriguez v. Ortiz, 2019 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 94304 (D.N.J. June 5, 2019)., #6 Exhibit (E) U.S. Soo Bahk Do Moo Duk Kwan Federation, Inc. v. Intl Tang Soo Do Moo Duk Kwan Assn, 2014 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 98017 (M.D. Pa. July 18, 2014), #7 Exhibit (F) Anhui Provincial Import & Export Corp. v. Hart Enters. Intl, 1996 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 6041 (S.D.N.Y. 1996)., #8 Exhibit (G) Kings Choice Neckwear, Inc. v. FedEx Corp., 2007 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 93843 (D.N.J. Dec. 20, 2007)., #9 Exhibit (H) Neal v. Asta Funding, Inc., 2013 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 170801 (D.N.J. Dec. 4, 2013), #10 Affidavit of Sammy Saka, #11 Exhibit (1) Exclusive Manufacturing Agreement, #12 Exhibit (2) A-R Register Report, #13 Exhibit (3) Payments Worksheet - Nov.2014, #14 Exhibit (4) November 2014 QBR Report, #15 Exhibit (5) November 3, 2014 Email from A. Maldonado, #16 Brief Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Petitioner Unicobas Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and in Support of its Cross-Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award or Alternatively, to Stay this Proceeding, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Certificate of Service)(CASSIRER, AURORA) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion reset for 5/17/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER adjourning the motion return date to May 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 4/19/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award , On Consent. (CASSIRER, AURORA) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by AURORA CASSIRER on behalf of SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC. (CASSIRER, AURORA) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by SAKAR INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award (CASSIRER, AURORA) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion reset for 5/3/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the return date for the Motion be adjourned to May 3, 2021; that, for the purposes of this Stipulation, facsimile or emailed signatures have the same force and effect as original signatures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/8/2021. (ld, ) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION for service and adjournment of motion date by UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.. (SCOOLIDGE, MARGARET) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award . Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, that a Certificate of Service is required to be filed with a MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ld, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award by UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Judgment)(SCOOLIDGE, MARGARET) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.. (SCOOLIDGE, MARGARET) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12298813.), filed by UNICOBA DA AMAZONIA S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M)(SCOOLIDGE, MARGARET) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less