Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2020 at 09:17:00 (UTC).

Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01709

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

UNLIMITED FINANCIAL FUNDING, LLC

HOWARD MARKOWITZ PA CPA

UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

RADIUS BANK

VALLEY NATIONAL BANK

PNC BANK, N.A.

CITIZENS BANK

SOUTH STATE BANK, N.A.

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

TRUIST BANK

TD BANK, N.A.

FAIRWINDS CREDIT UNION

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

REGIONS BANK

FLAGSHIP BANK

FIRST CITRUS BANK

MIDWEST REGIONAL BANK

STEARNS BANK, N.A.

HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leon N. Patricios

Attorney at Zumpano, Patricios & Winker, PA

312 Minorca Ave

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

Allen Paige Pegg

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 2700

Miami, FL 33131-3085

Clark E. Alpert

Attorney at Weiner Law Group LLP

629 Parsippany Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Jeohn Salone Favors

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Jessica R. Ecker

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Thomas Kevin Knight

Attorney at de Beaubien, Simmons, Knight, Mantzaris & Neal, LLP

3999 N. Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935

Charles W. Prueter

Attorney at Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Larry B. Childs

Attorney at Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP

1901 6Th Ave N, Suite 1400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Peter P. Hargitai

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

Suite 3900, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Helen Eckinger

Attorney at Wallen Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP

1901 Sixth Ave North, Suite 1400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Charles A. Buford

Attorney at Johnson, Pope, Bokor, Ruppel & Burns, LLP

911 Chestnut St, Po Box 1368

Clearwater, FL 33757

Howard S. Toland

Attorney at Mitrani, Rynor, Adamsky & Toland PA

1200 Weston Rd Penthouse

Weston, FL 33326-1987

Ashley Simonsen

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars., Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Andrew Soukup

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth St Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Gregory C. Cook

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North., Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Other Attorneys

Enu A. Mainigi

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jeffry R. Jontz

Attorney at Fishback, Dominick, Bennett, Ardaman, Ahlers, Langley,Geller

1947 Lee Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789-1834

Phillip Stuart Smith

Attorney at McLin & Burnsed, PA

1000 W Main St, Po Box 491357

Leesburg, FL 34749

Antonio M. Haynes

Attorney at DAVIS POLK & WARDWELL LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Ramsey B. Prather

Attorney at Butler Wooten & Peak LLP

105 13Th St., P.O. Box 2766

Columbus, GA 31902

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#194

(#194) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#193

(#193) NOTICE of compliance re 151 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 152 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PNC Bank, N.A. (Varner, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#192

(#192) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Radius Bank. Related case(s): No (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#191

(#191) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Radius Bank. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#188

(#188) WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#185

(#190) ENDORSED ORDER granting #185 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Ashley Simonsen Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#184

(#189) ENDORSED ORDER granting #184 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Andrew Soukup Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#191) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Radius Bank. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#192) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Radius Bank. Related case(s): No (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #29

Proposed Summons Wells Fargo Summons

1 #24

Proposed Summons The First Summons 2

1 #8

Proposed Summons Citizens First Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons Citizens Bank Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons Chase Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons South State Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons Bank of America Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Comparison Chart 7(a) and PPP

220 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Peter A. Pastore, appearing on behalf of Trustco Bank (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061956.). (JLD) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#193) NOTICE of compliance re 151 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 152 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PNC Bank, N.A. (Varner, Joseph) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#192) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Radius Bank. Related case(s): No (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#191) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Radius Bank. (Pegg, Allen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#190) ENDORSED ORDER granting #185 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Ashley Simonsen Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, she shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#189) ENDORSED ORDER granting #184 Defendant Stearns Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion to Grant Andrew Soukup Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/16/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#188) WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/13/2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Popok, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#187) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #147 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant, First Citrus Bank, to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant First Citrus Bank shall have up to and including October 19, 2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. ALL DEFENDANTS have been given up to and including October 19, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (See previous Endorsed Order 157) Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/15/2020. (AKJ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#186) ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DENYING IN PART #150 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond Pending a Pretrial Conference to Consolidate Future Motion Practice, or in the Alternative, Motion for an Order Setting a Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Schedule with Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Plaintiffs' deadlines for filing responses to the motions to dismiss shall be extended until the Court decides whether this action should be severed, such that each Defendant is sued separately by any allegedly injured Plaintiff(s). The Complaint fails to provide sufficient allegations to support a conclusion that the claims against the various Defendants are reasonably related or properly joined. Plaintiffs are therefore ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, why the Plaintiffs' claims against the various Defendants should not be severed and Plaintiffs ordered to file separate actions. Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to reply to Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response. Should the matter be allowed to proceed as pleaded, the Court will hold a Rule 16 conference to coordinate the proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/15/2020. (AKJ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by UNBEHAGEN TAX AND ACCOUNTING, INC. d/b/a UNBEHAGEN ADVISORS of Filing Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer and Consolidate Related Case)(Klein, Jason) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER of service returned executed on August 6, 2020 by Howard Markowitz PA CPA, Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC as to Stearns Bank, N.A.. (Patricios, Leon) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MCB) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/27/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/27/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC . (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Howard Markowitz PA CPA (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc. (Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1709-T-35CPT. (LRB) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17096561) filed by Unbehagen Tax and Accounting, Inc., Howard Markowitz PA CPA, and Unlimited Financial Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Comparison Chart 7(a) and PPP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Addition Financial, #4 Proposed Summons Bank of America, #5 Proposed Summons South State, #6 Proposed Summons Chase, #7 Proposed Summons Citizens Bank, #8 Proposed Summons Citizens First, #9 Proposed Summons Fairwinds, #10 Proposed Summons First Citrus, #11 Proposed Summons Flagship, #12 Proposed Summons Hancock Whitney, #13 Proposed Summons Midwest Regional, #14 Proposed Summons PNC, #15 Proposed Summons Prime Meridian, #16 Proposed Summons Radius, #17 Proposed Summons Regions, #18 Proposed Summons Seacoast, #19 Proposed Summons Stearns, #20 Proposed Summons Synovus, #21 Proposed Summons TD, #22 Proposed Summons Bank of Tampa, #23 Proposed Summons The First, #24 Proposed Summons The First 2, #25 Proposed Summons Truist, #26 Proposed Summons Trustco, #27 Proposed Summons USF, #28 Proposed Summons Valley, #29 Proposed Summons WellsFargo)(Patricios, Leon) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Radius Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where FLAGSHIP BANK FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST CITRUS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH STATE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION is a litigant