This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 08:10:35 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. v. OpenDeal Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against OpenDeal Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09358

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Defendant

OpenDeal Inc. doing business as Republic

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Michael Nuzzaci

Jason Douglas Jones

David Donahue

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Thomas Perala

John Jacob Rosenberg

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER denying #20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #20 . GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The Court's order of November 30, 2021, directed the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan by February 1, 2022. ECF No. 11. The Court did not schedule an initial pretrial conference for that date. The parties' request to adjourn the deadline to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan is DENIED. Defendant's request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to January 18, 2022, is GRANTED. So Ordered. OpenDeal Inc. answer due 1/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2022) (js) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#20

(#20) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue, Esq., and John J. Rosenberg, Esq. dated 1/6/2022., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue, Esq., and John J. Rosenberg, Esq. dated 1/6/2022. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#19

(#19) DECLARATION of David Donahue - Service re: #1 Complaint,, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Summons Issued, #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet . Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Letter Motion for Conference re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. The parties' request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED. Plaintiff's request to file a motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED. Accordingly, 1. By January 24, 2022, Plaintiff shall file its motion for a preliminary injunction. 2. By February 14, 2022, Defendant shall file its opposition papers. 3. By February 28, 2022, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2021) (kv) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#17

(#17) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John J. Rosenberg dated 12/14/21 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. . Document filed by OpenDeal Inc...(Perala, Brett) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of OpenDeal Inc...(Perala, Brett) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#15

(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OpenDeal Inc...(Rosenberg, John) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#13

(#13) LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#8

(#19) DECLARATION of David Donahue - Service re: #1 Complaint,, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Summons Issued, #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet . Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #10

Exhibit J - Webpage

1 #9

Exhibit I - cease and desist letter

1 #7

Exhibit G - Webpage

1 #6

Exhibit F - Communication

1 #5

Exhibit E - Communication

1 #3

Exhibit C - Rolling Stone article

1 #2

Exhibit B - Billboard article

1 #1

Exhibit A - Billboard article

1 #1

Main Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER denying #20 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #20 . GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The Court's order of November 30, 2021, directed the parties to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan by February 1, 2022. ECF No. 11. The Court did not schedule an initial pretrial conference for that date. The parties' request to adjourn the deadline to submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan is DENIED. Defendant's request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to January 18, 2022, is GRANTED. So Ordered. OpenDeal Inc. answer due 1/18/2022. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/7/2022) (js) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue, Esq., and John J. Rosenberg, Esq. dated 1/6/2022., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue, Esq., and John J. Rosenberg, Esq. dated 1/6/2022. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION of David Donahue - Service re: #1 Complaint,, #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Summons Issued, #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney, #2 Civil Cover Sheet . Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/24/2022. Responses due by 2/14/2022 Replies due by 2/28/2022. (kv) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Letter Motion for Conference re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. The parties' request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED. Plaintiff's request to file a motion for a preliminary injunction is GRANTED. Accordingly, 1. By January 24, 2022, Plaintiff shall file its motion for a preliminary injunction. 2. By February 14, 2022, Defendant shall file its opposition papers. 3. By February 28, 2022, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 12/16/2021) (kv) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from John J. Rosenberg dated 12/14/21 re: #13 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. . Document filed by OpenDeal Inc...(Perala, Brett) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of OpenDeal Inc...(Perala, Brett) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by OpenDeal Inc...(Rosenberg, John) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of OpenDeal Inc...(Rosenberg, John) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David Donahue dated December 7, 2021. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Michael Nuzzaci on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc...(Nuzzaci, Daniel) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Douglas Jones on behalf of UMG Recordings, Inc...(Jones, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OpenDeal Inc. d/b/a Republic, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Donahue, David) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Universal Music Group, N.V. for UMG Recordings, Inc.. Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc...(Donahue, David) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Donahue, David) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OpenDeal Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25324004)Document filed by UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Billboard article, #2 Exhibit B - Billboard article, #3 Exhibit C - Rolling Stone article, #4 Exhibit D - Registrations, #5 Exhibit E - Communication, #6 Exhibit F - Communication, #7 Exhibit G - Webpage, #8 Exhibit H - Manifesto, #9 Exhibit I - cease and desist letter, #10 Exhibit J - Webpage, #11 Exhibit K - Webpage, #12 Exhibit L - Tweet, #13 Exhibit M - Article, #14 Exhibit N - Article).(Donahue, David) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less