This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2021 at 08:20:40 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lurana S. Snow and William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-60914

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Universal Music Corp.

PolyGram Publishing, Inc.

Universal Music - MGB NA LLC

Capitol Records, LLC

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Universal Musica, Inc.

Universal Music Z Tunes LLC

Defendants

Jack Owoc

Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. d/b/a Bang Energy

Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. doing business as Bang Energy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James George Sammataro

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

201 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Brendan Stuart Everman

Attorney at Stroock Stroock & Lavan LLP

200 S. Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

Andrew R. Schindler

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

100 S.E. Second Street

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#3

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Due to ongoing settlement discussions to resolve this case, the deadline for Defendant VPI to respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to July 6, 2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/17/2021. (mkz) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Attorney Andrew R. Schindler added to party Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schindler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Jack Owoc, Vital Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pes) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capitol Records, LLC, PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Musica, Inc. (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Capitol Records, LLC, PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Musica, Inc. re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Sammataro, James) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed (cds) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 121 and Complaint Mailed TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14644981, filed by PolyGram Publishing, Inc., Universal Music Corp., Songs of Universal, Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Universal Musica, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to Bang Energy, #3 Summon(s) as to Jack Owoc, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Sammataro, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Polygram Publishing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC is a litigant