This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2021 at 07:38:11 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc et al v. Frontier Communications Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 UMG Recordings, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Frontier Communications Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05253

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rhino Entertainment LLC

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

Arista Music

ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.

Big Beat Records Inc

Zomba Recording LLC

Volcano Entertainment III, LLC

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

Rhino Entertainment Company

Warner Music Inc.

Warner Music International Services Limited

Maverick Recording Company

Warner Records Inc.

Sony Music Entertainment US Latin

Arista Records LLC

Atlantic Records Group LLC

Laface Records LLC

Lava Records LLC

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Defendant, Debtor and In Re

Frontier Communications Corporation

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Luskin

Attorney at Luskin, Stern & Eisler LLP

50 Main Street, Ste 1640

White Plains, NY 10606

Stephan Edward Hornung

Attorney at Luskin, Stern & Eisler LLP

50 Main Street

White Plans, NY 10606

Matthew Jan Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Lucy Grace D. Noyola

Attorney at Oppenheim and Zebrak, LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Chad John Husnick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (IL)

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Mark Edward McKane

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

555 California Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Massimo Fabio D'Angelo

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Patrick Venter

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Stephen Edward Hessler

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit 8

10 #2

Exhibit 9

10 #3

Exhibit 10

10 #4

Exhibit 11

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD). Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Copyright Claimants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(Luskin, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Matthew J. Oppenheim in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD).. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11).(Luskin, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Austin Klar in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD).. Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(D'Angelo, Massimo) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD). . Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(D'Angelo, Massimo) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Letter,,, filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Maverick Recording Company, Laface Records LLC, Arista Music, Nonesuch Records Inc., Bad Boy Records LLC, Warner Records Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc., Big Beat Records Inc, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Atlantic Records Group LLC, Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Warner Music International Services Limited, Capitol Records, LLC, Frontier Communications Corporation, Rhino Entertainment LLC, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Records LLC. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 6/24/2021, Replies due by 7/1/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/24/2021) (kv) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Matthew J. Oppenheim and Ruben Castillo dated 6/23/21 re: Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference [ECF No. 1]. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Frontier Communications Corporation, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05050-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-5050. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD).. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew J. Oppenheim in Support re: #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD).. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Atlantic Records Group LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Big Beat Records Inc, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled by Ramen LLC, Laface Records LLC, Lava Records LLC, Maverick Recording Company, Nonesuch Records Inc., Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Music Nashville LLC, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY WITHDRAWAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 21-cv-5050. (bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 20-B-22476 (RDD).Document filed by Laface Records LLC, Bad Boy Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Music International Services Limited, Big Beat Records Inc, Fueled by Ramen LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Nonesuch Records Inc., Maverick Recording Company, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Warner Records Inc., Warner Music Nashville LLC, Arista Records LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Lava Records LLC, Roadrunner Records, Inc., Atlantic Records Group LLC, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Capitol Records, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, Warner Music Inc...(bkar) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAFACE RECORDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rhino Entertainment Company is a litigant