This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2021 at 23:51:25 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Frontier Communications Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Frontier Communications Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05050

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rhino Entertainment LLC

Arista Records LLC

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

Sony Music Entertainment

Arista Music

Warner Music Inc.

ABKCO Music & Records, Inc.

Warner Music International Services Limited

Capitol Records, LLC

Sony Music Entertainment US Latin

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Zomba Recording LLC

Lava Records LLC

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Warner Records Inc.

Defendant

Frontier Communications Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lucy Grace D. Noyola

Attorney at Oppenheim and Zebrak, LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Matthew Jan Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Austin L. Klar

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Massimo Fabio D'Angelo

Attorney at Akerman LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Ildefonso Mas

Attorney at Akerman LLP

750 9Th Street, N.W., Suite 750

Washington, DC 20001

Ruben Castillo

Attorney at Akerman LLP

71 S Wacker Dr, Ste 47Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

37 #1

Exhibit 1

37 #37

Main Document

#36

35 #17

Exhibit Q

35 #15

Exhibit O

35 #13

Exhibit M

35 #11

Exhibit K

35 #10

Exhibit J

35 #3

Exhibit C

35 #1

Exhibit A

#31

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Matthew Jan Oppenheim to RE-FILE re: Document No. #37 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the pleading is amended more than 21 days after service of the original pleading; Court's leave has not been granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Frontier Communications Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Rhino Entertainment LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Arista Records LLC, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Records Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony Music Entertainment, Lava Records LLC, Arista Music. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Oppenheim, Matthew) Modified on 9/7/2021 (vf). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(Castillo, Ruben) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) DECLARATION of Matthew J. Oppenheim in Opposition re: #31 MOTION to Stay .. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S).(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #31 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #31 MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(Castillo, Ruben) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DECLARATION of Rubn Castillo in Support re: #31 MOTION to Stay .. Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(Castillo, Ruben) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Stay . Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(Castillo, Ruben) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. GRANTED. The deadline for submitting a joint letter and jointly proposed case management plan is ADJOURNED to seven days after the Court's decision on Defendant Frontier's forthcoming motion to stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/11/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File jointly proposed case management plan addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Rubn Castillo dated August 5, 2021. Document filed by Frontier Communications Corporation..(Castillo, Ruben) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(pc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frontier Communications Corporation..(pc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc. ; Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Group Corporation for Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Zomba Recording LLC. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frontier Communications Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Capitol Records, LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Lava Records LLC, Rhino Entertainment LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Warner Records Inc., Zomba Recording LLC..(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Frontier Communications Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24645611)Document filed by Rhino Entertainment LLC, Zomba Recording LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Warner Music International Services Limited, Arista Records LLC, ABKCO Music & Records, Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Inc., Sony Music Entertainment US Latin, Warner Records Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Sony Music Entertainment, Lava Records LLC, Arista Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Oppenheim, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rhino Entertainment Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ZOMBA RECORDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABKCO Music & Records, Inc. is a litigant