This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 08:54:19 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc et al v. Charter Communications, Inc

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02020

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Capitol Records, LLC

Universal Music Corp

Universal Music MGB NA LLC

Universal Music Publishing Inc.

UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB

UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED

UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED

Universal Music Z Tunes LLC

Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited

POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Warner Chappell Music, Inc

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp

W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp.

W.C.M. Music Corp.

Unichappell Music Inc.

Cotillion Music, Inc.

INTERSONG U.S.A. INC.

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janette L. Ferguson

Attorney at Williams Weese Pepple & Ferguson PC

1801 California Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Alexander Kaplan

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Anders Linderot

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-New York

620 Eighth Avenue, The New York Times Building

New York, NY 10018-1405

Jeffrey M. Gould

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

John Hardy Ehlers

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Jonathan Michael Sperling

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-New York

620 Eighth Avenue, The New York Times Building

New York, NY 10018-1405

Matthew J. Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Neema T. Sahni

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-Los Angeles

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

Scott A. Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Avenue N.W., 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20016

Stacey Kamya Grigsby

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP-DC

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Other Attorneys

Andrew H. Schapiro

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP-Chicago

191 N Wacker Dr, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Charles Kramer Verhoeven

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP-San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Craig D. Joyce

Attorney at Fairfield & Woods, P.C.

1801 California Street, Suite 2600

Denver, CO 80202-2645

David Eiseman, IV

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP-San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dylan I. Scher

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP-New York

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

John Markham Tanner

Attorney at Fairfield & Woods, P.C.

1801 California Street, Suite 2600

Denver, CO 80202-2645

Linda J. Brewer

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP-San Francisco

50 California Street, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE Statement by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Charter Communications, Inc. Charter Communications, Inc answer due 9/17/2021. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Markham Tanner on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney John Markham Tanner added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Tanner, John) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig D. Joyce on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Craig D. Joyce added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Joyce, Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dylan I. Scher on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Dylan I. Scher added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Scher, Dylan) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Linda J. Brewer on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Linda J. Brewer added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Brewer, Linda) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney David Eiseman, IV added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Eiseman, David) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Schapiro on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Andrew H. Schapiro added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Kramer Verhoeven on behalf of Charter Communications, IncAttorney Charles Kramer Verhoeven added to party Charter Communications, Inc(pty:dft) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#10) CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally randomly assigned incorrectly, therefore this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02020-RM. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Pursuant to [#8] Order, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02020-MEH . Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE: Exercising the prerogative of a Senior Judge, the undersigned declines assignment of this case and directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to another judicial officer. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/27/21. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. by Plaintiffs Capitol Records, LLC, Cotillion Music, Inc, EMI April Music Inc, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc (I), EMI Entertainment World Inc, EMI Feist Catalog Inc, EMI Miller Catalog Inc, Intersong USA, Inc, Jobete Music Co, Inc, Polygram Publishing, Inc, Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc, Songs of Universal, Inc, Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, Stone Agate Music, UMG Recordings, Inc, Unichappell Music Inc, Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc, Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty Limited, W Chappell Music Corp, WCM Music Corp, Warner Chappell Music, Inc, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Janette L. Ferguson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Charter Communications Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7977439)Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Capitol Records, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Cotillion Music, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI April Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI Blackwood Music Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI Feist Catalog Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party EMI MILLER CATALOG INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party INTERSONG U.S.A. INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Jobete Music Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Songs of Universal, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Stone Agate Music(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Unichappell Music Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Corp(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music MGB NA LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Publishing Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal Music Z Tunes LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party W.C.M. Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Warner Chappell Music, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Janette L. Ferguson added to party Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp(pty:pla), filed by POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC., EMI April Music Inc, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING LIMITED, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Capitol Records, LLC, EMI Blackwood Music Inc, UMG Recordings, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Warner Chappell Music, Inc, W.C.M. Music Corp., EMI CONSORTIUM MUSIC PUBLISHING INC. D/B/A EMI FULL KEEL MUSIC, Stone Agate Music, EMI ENTERTAINMENT WORLD INC. D/B/A EMI FORAY MUSIC, EMI MILLER CATALOG INC., UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING AB, Jobete Music Co., Inc., Universal Music Corp, Universal Music Z Tunes LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, W Chappell Music Corp dba WC Music Corp., Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC, UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING MGB LIMITED, Universal Music MGB NA LLC, EMI CONSORTIUM SONGS, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A EMI LONGITUDE MUSIC, Universal/MCA Music Publishing Pty. Limited, INTERSONG U.S.A. INC., Universal Music Publishing Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Ferguson, Janette) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where W CHAPPELL MUSIC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant