This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 06:51:32 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. et al v. Bright House Networks, LLC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Bright House Networks, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas G. Wilson and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00710

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMI Mills Music, Inc.

Universal Music Publishing Inc.

Universal Music Corp.

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

EMI Miller Catalog Inc.

Arista Music

EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music

EMI Blackwood Music Inc.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Colgems-EMI Music Inc.

Zomba Recording LLC

Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited

Volcano Entertainment III, LLC

Universal Music Publishing AB

EMI Feist Catalog Inc.

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

Rhino Entertainment Company

Cotillion Music, Inc.

Universal Music Publishing Limited

Defendant

Bright House Networks, LLC.

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan D. Hull

Attorney at Bush Ross, PA

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602-2656

Marc Chen

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4643

David Christopher Banker

Attorney at Bush Ross, PA

1801 N Highland Ave

Tampa, FL 33602-2656

Jeffrey M. Gould

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw 5Th Flr

Washington, DC 20818

Mitchell A. Kamin

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4343

Matthew J. Oppenheim

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw 5Th Flr

Washington, DC 20818

William O'Neil

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Rebecca G. Van Tassell

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4343

Jacqueline C. Charlesworth

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

620 Eighth Ave 43Rd Fl

New York, NY 10018-1405

Neema T. Sahni

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4343

Megan O'Neil

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Kerry Malloy Mustico

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw 5Th Flr

Washington, DC 20818

Scott A. Zebrak

Attorney at Oppenheim & Zebrak LLP

4530 Wisconsin Ave Nw 5Th Flr

Washington, DC 20818

Defendant Attorneys

Stacey Foltz Stark

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Michael S. Elkin

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

William J. Schifino, Jr.

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

201 N Franklin St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

Seth E. Spitzer

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Thomas Patrick Lane

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

200 Park Avenu

New York, NY 10166

Jennifer A. Golinveaux

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN, LLP

101 California Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5840

John A. Schifino

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2500

Tampa, FL 33602-5226

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#35

#33

#32

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION for leave to file reply brief in further support of Motion to Dismiss by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER granting #40 Plaintiffs' Motion for attorneys Mark Chen, William O'Neil, and Megan O'Neill to Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/3/2019. (DMS) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Mark Chen, William O'Neil and Megan M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #32 Motion to dismiss filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Bad Boy Records LLC, Capitol Records, LLC, Colgems-EMI Music Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI April Music Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., EMI Consortium Music Publishing Inc. d/b/a EMI Full Keel Music, EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., individually, and d/b/a EMI Longitude Music, EMI Entertainment World Inc. d/b/a EMI Foray Music, EMI Feist Catalog Inc., EMI Jemaxal Music Inc., EMI Miller Catalog Inc., EMI Mills Music, Inc., EMI U Catalog Inc., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Fueled By Ramen LLC, Intersong U.S.A., Inc., Jobete Music Co. Inc., LaFace Records LLC, Nonesuch Records Inc., Polygram Publishing, Inc., Provident Label Group, LLC, Rhino Entertainment Company, Rightson Music Inc., Roadrunner Records, Inc., Screen Gems-EMI Music Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment, Sony Music Entertainment US Latin LLC, Sony/ATV Music Publishing LLC, Stone Agate Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., UMG Recordings, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Universal Music - MGB NA LLC, Universal Music - Z Tunes LLC, Universal Music Corp., Universal Music Publishing AB, Universal Music Publishing Inc., Universal Music Publishing Limited, Universal Music Publishing MGB Limited, Volcano Entertainment III, LLC, W.B.M. Music Corp., WB Music Corp., WEA International Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Zomba Recording LLC. (Kamin, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Attorney Rebecca G. Van Tassell as counsel of record and recipient of filings for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/28/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca Van Tassell to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Van Tassell, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion to extend time; denying as moot #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GRANTING #33 the Parties' Joint Consent Motion and Stipulated Briefing Schedule Related to Defendant Bright House Networks, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability; DENYING AS MOOT #35 the Parties Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including July 1, 2019 to respond to Defendant's Motion. Thereafter, Defendant shall file an answer to the remaining allegations in the Complaint within fourteen (14) days from the date of the Court's Order on the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/12/2019. (Wilson, Thomas) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Vicarious Liability by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kamin, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Joint MOTION to extend time to and set briefing schedule relating to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Bright House Networks, LLC.. (Schifino, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 plaintiffs' motion for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/27/2019. (DMS) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Amended MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Jonathan M. Sperling, Jacqueline C. Charlesworth, Neema T. Sahni, and Rebecca Van Tassell to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Matthew J. Oppenheim, Scott A. Zebrak, Jeffrey M. Gould, and Kerry M. Mustico to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Mitchell A. Kamin, Neema T. Sahni, Rebecca G. Van Tassell, Jonathan M. Sperling, and Jacqueline C. Charlesworth to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Hull, Bryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (LD) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Bright House Networks, LLC. (LD) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/25/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-710-T-35TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15272664) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hull, Bryan) Modified on 3/25/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMI Mills Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rhino Entertainment Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ZOMBA RECORDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMI Miller Catalog Inc. is a litigant