This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:24:04 (UTC).

Ultravision Technologies, LLC v. Yaham Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Ultravision Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Yaham Optoelectronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00398

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ultravision Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Yaham Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Lawrence Chester Drucker

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra Carcaterra Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Sarah Gabrielle Hartman

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP - Irvine

2211 Michelson Drive, Seventh Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

John Andrew Rubino

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Daniel James Shea, Jr

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Timothy J Rousseau

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

T Vann Pearce, Jr

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington DC

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Gregory Blake Thompson

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

James Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

609 Main St., 40Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) Modified on 1/31/2020 (nkl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/2/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) ORDER Severing Claims from Civil Action 2:18cv100. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/6/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:19-cv-00252. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 4, Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) Modified on 1/31/2020 (nkl, ). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:19-cv-00252. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/20. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman, Jury Selection dates and deadlines for submitting Motions for Entry of Docket Control Orders and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/2/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER Severing Claims from Civil Action 2:18cv100. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/6/2019. (nkl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less