This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 15:22:17 (UTC).

Ultravision Technologies, LLC v. SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Ultravision Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO , LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ultravision Technologies, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Samsung Display Co., Ltd.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

Consolidated Defendants

Yaham Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.

Barco NV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Timothy J Rousseau

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Lawrence Chester Drucker

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Sarah Gabrielle Hartman

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP - Irvine

2211 Michelson Drive, Seventh Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

John Andrew Rubino

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Daniel James Shea, Jr

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra Carcaterra Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

David S Chun

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - East Palo Alto

1900 University Ave, 6Th Floor

East Pala Alto, CA 94303

Steven Pepe

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - New York

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Hyun-Joong Kim

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - NY

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-8704

Alexander Ernest Middleton

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - NY

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-8704

Allen Cross

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - DC

2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-6807

Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

T Vann Pearce, Jr

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington DC

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Jeffrey Lance Johnson

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

609 Main St., 40Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Gregory Blake Thompson

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

James Mark Mann

Attorney at Mann Tindel & Thompson

300 W. Main

Henderson, TX 75652

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#56

#55

#54

#53

#52

49 #1

Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Discovery Order

#49

47 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order

#47

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ultravision Technologies, LLC regarding service of its Initial and Additional Disclosures to Barco NV (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ultravision Technologies, LLC regarding service of its Initial and Additional Disclosures to Samsung Defendants (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSet Scheduling Order Deadlines - Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2020. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2021 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 8/19/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Motions in Limine due by 12/14/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/21/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER granting #47 Motion for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) DISCOVERY ORDER re #49 Motion for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2020. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION To Reschedule and Align Markman Proceedings by Barco NV. (Rusnak, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Discovery Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Barco NV (Rusnak, Eric) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J Rousseau on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Rousseau, Timothy) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Carcaterra Messing on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Messing, Alessandra) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Mercadante on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Mercadante, Joseph) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Chester Drucker on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Drucker, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Ultravision Technologies, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Ultravision Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Aral Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate A&A LED Technologies, LLC for Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., Samsung Display Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7359122.), filed by Ultravision Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ultravision Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Display Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Vann Pearce Jr.