This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2019 at 08:47:11 (UTC).

Ultra Dairy LLC v. Conrad et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Ultra Dairy LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Conrad. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01353

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ultra Dairy LLC

Defendants

XYZ Corporations 1-5

George Conrad

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP - NY Office

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Patrick J Boyle

Attorney at Venable LLP - NY Office

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ultra Dairy LLC re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Boyle on behalf of Ultra Dairy LLC (Boyle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

7 #4

New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form

7 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

7 #2

Declaration of Sponsor Jessie Beeber

7 #1

Petition for Admission to Practice

#7

(#7) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick John Boyle Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4965239. filed by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission to Practice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor Jessie Beeber, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Letter Motion from Jessie F. Beeber for Ultra Dairy LLC requesting Leave of Court, Ex Parte, for Early Discovery submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 11/16/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to George Conrad. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against George Conrad, John Does 1-5, XYZ Corporations 1-5 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4930517) filed by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ultra Dairy LLC re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Boyle on behalf of Ultra Dairy LLC (Boyle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Patrick John Boyle is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Ultra Dairy LLC. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/11/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick John Boyle Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4965239. filed by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission to Practice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor Jessie Beeber, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER: GRANTING #4 plaintiff's motion seeking leave to conduct expedited discovery based upon the showing of reasonableness and good cause set forth in plaintiff's letter brief, and the legal authority cited therein. This ruling does not preclude the specified third parties from whom plaintiff will seek discovery from pursuing, in good faith, challenges to plaintiff's subpoenas. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/19/2019. (nmk) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter Motion from Jessie F. Beeber for Ultra Dairy LLC requesting Leave of Court, Ex Parte, for Early Discovery submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 11/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Does 1-5 and XYZ Corporations 1-5 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Does" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.15 and summons will be issued at that time. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to George Conrad. (sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against George Conrad, John Does 1-5, XYZ Corporations 1-5 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4930517) filed by Ultra Dairy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessie F Beeber(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Joseph Boyle Esquire