This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:14:49 (UTC).

Ullrich v. Idaho Supreme Court et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Ullrich filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Idaho Supreme Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Floyd Ullrich

Boise, ID 83707

Defendants

Third District Court of Idaho

Idaho State Bar

Canyon County Prosecutors Office

Canyon County Public Defenders Office

Idaho Court of Appeals

Fourth District Court of Idaho

Idaho Judicial Council

Idaho Supreme Court

Idaho Public Defence Commission

Idaho Parole Commission

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Second Statement by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich re #3 Complaint. (ckh)

#4

(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

#7

(#7) Petition for Permission to Proceed by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Predisclosure Request by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Appointment of Council by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

3 #1

Statement of Stephen Ullrich

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Canyon County Prosecutors Office, Canyon County Public Defenders Office, Fourth District Court of Idaho, Idaho Court of Appeals, Idaho Judicial Council, Idaho Parole Commission, Idaho Public Defence Commission, Idaho State Bar, Idaho Supreme Court, Third District Court of Idaho, filed by Stephen Floyd Ullrich.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Statement of Stephen Ullrich) (kt). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second Statement by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich re #3 Complaint. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • (#8) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Petition for Permission to Proceed by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Predisclosure Request by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Appointment of Council by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Canyon County Prosecutors Office, Canyon County Public Defenders Office, Fourth District Court of Idaho, Idaho Court of Appeals, Idaho Judicial Council, Idaho Parole Commission, Idaho Public Defence Commission, Idaho State Bar, Idaho Supreme Court, Third District Court of Idaho, filed by Stephen Floyd Ullrich.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Statement of Stephen Ullrich) (kt). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Floyd Ullrich. (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Stephen Floyd Ullrich. Responses due by 1/7/2020 (kt) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.