This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2023 at 20:00:21 (UTC).

UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04725

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund

Defendants

West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Roxane Laboratories, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karin Elizabeth Garvey

Veronica M Bosco

Robin van der Meulen

Mary L. Russell

Domenico Minerva

Gregory Asciolla

Scott M. Grzenczyk

Matthew Perez

Dena C. Sharp

Defendant Attorneys

Heather Marie Burke

Jack E. Pace, III

Kathryn J. Mims

Stephen Darren Andrews

Jeffrey E. Faucette

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy Koh no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/21. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#49

(#49) TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#47

(#47) ORDER RE MOTION TO RELATE, MOTION TO TRANSFER, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/16/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#45

(#45) ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO RELATE by Judge Vince Chhabria in case 3:20-cv-04056-VC. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-04056-VC, 3:20-cv-04064-VC, 3:20-cv-04667-VC, 3:20-cv-04671-VC, 3:20-cv-04725-VC(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#44

(#44) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pace.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#43

No Description Available

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#36

(#50) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot #36 Stipulation Regarding Hearing Dates. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#23

RESTRICTED

#35

#32

#31

#30

#29

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy Koh no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/21. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docket(#51) You are receiving this Notice because this case has been assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. On December 13, 2021, Judge Koh was confirmed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The parties to this action are instructed to meet and confer to determine if collectively they will consent to transfer of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. On or before January 5, 2022, each party must file either (1) written consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge or (2) a request for reassignment of this case to a district judge. The parties may consent to the jurisdiction of a specific Magistrate Judge regardless of the division of the Court to which that Judge is assigned. In the event that the parties decline consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will be randomly reassigned to a district judge who likely will not be resident in the San Jose division of the Court. ON BEHALF OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, Richard Seeborg, Chief Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying as Moot #36 Stipulation Regarding Hearing Dates. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Transcript of Proceedings held on October 15, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (82 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order, (81 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER RE MOTION TO RELATE, MOTION TO TRANSFER, MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/16/2020. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#46) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2020 re (43 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, (47 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by New York State Teamsters Council Health and Hospital Fund, (54 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) MOTION to Transfer Case Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of New Jersey Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference not held on 10/16/2020. The Court will issue a written order summarizing the outcome of today's proceedings.Total Time in Court: 24 minutes. Court Reporter: Hearing recorded via Zoom Webinar: 10:08 - 10:32. Plaintiff Attorney: Dena Sharp and Ken Wexler for NY Teamsters; Dena Sharp, Thomas Sobol, and Jessica MacAuley for Blue Cross and Blue Shield; Dena Sharp, Gregory Asciolla and Karin Garvey for UFCW Local 1500; Dena Sharp and Thomas Sobol for Government Health Employee Association; Cory Lee for Ruth Hollman; Michael Buchman for Providence. Defendant Attorney: Devora Allon and Gilad Bendheim for Amneal Pharmaceuticals; Teagan Gregory, Heidi Hubbard, Stanley Fisher, and Benjamin Greenblum for Jazz; Kathryn Mims and Jack Pace for Hikma; Benjamin Bradshaw and Stephen McIntyre for Par. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2020) Modified on 10/16/2020: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO RELATE by Judge Vince Chhabria in case 3:20-cv-04056-VC. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-04056-VC, 3:20-cv-04064-VC, 3:20-cv-04667-VC, 3:20-cv-04671-VC, 3:20-cv-04725-VC(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Pace.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Domenico Minerva ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14759708.) filed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Minerva, Domenico) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/30/2020) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14695834.). Filed byUFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less