This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2021 at 10:35:08 (UTC).

Udy v. The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Udy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Udy

Defendant

The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellen Sprovach

Attorney at Rosenberg Sprovach

3518 Travis, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Jason T Contreras

Attorney at Office Of The Attorney General

P O Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center 3/22/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scott Udy, filed.(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Contreras, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(GeorgeKelneradi, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center filed by Scott Udy. (0541-25755817) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#1

(#1) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center, filed.(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center 3/22/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Contreras, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Scott Udy, filed.(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center served on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021, filed.(Contreras, Jason) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(GeorgeKelneradi, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center filed by Scott Udy. (0541-25755817) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Request for Issuance of Summons as to The University of Texas MD Anderson Cancer Center, filed.(Sprovach, Ellen) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MD ANDERSON CANCER CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason T Contreras