This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2022 at 07:17:24 (UTC).

Ualat v. The American Bottling Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Ualat filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The American Bottling Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04184

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joash Ualat

Defendants

The American Bottling Company

Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hunter Pyle

Natalia Ramirez Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley David Doucette

Daniel Chul Whang

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Declaration of John Tynan in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Declaration of Daniel Whang in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/20 22. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#8

(#8) *Filing Error. See dkt #9 for Corrections*CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company Amended [Signed] Certificate of Service (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joash Ualat.. (Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 7/29/2022) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company.. (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 8/1/2022) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company.. (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 8/1/2022) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joash Ualat.. (Pyle, Hunter) (Filed on 7/29/2022) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company Amended [Signed] Certificate of Service (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 7/20/2022) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *Filing Error. See dkt #9 for Corrections*CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company (Doucette, Bradley) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/20/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/20 22. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#1) Answer to Removal Complaint (see Exhibit F of Removal Complaint) byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Keurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration of Daniel Whang in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of John Tynan in Support of 1 Notice of Removal, filed byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Alameda. Their case number is 22CV012252. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17361461). Filed byKeurig Dr. Pepper Inc., The American Bottling Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whang, Daniel) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less