This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:46:25 (UTC).

Tzoumi v. Turkish Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Tzoumi filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Turkish Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dora Lizette Irizarry and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01730

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andriani Tzoumi

Defendant

Turkish Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lambros Yiannakou Lambrou

Attorney at The Lambrou Law Firm P.C.

45 Broadway, Suite 3120

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Carlsen

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION of Discontinuance Without Prejudice by Andriani Tzoumi (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andriani Tzoumi (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#7

(#7) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Andriani Tzoumi. (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

5 #1

Rule 7.1 Statement

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 5/30/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/16/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11322826 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Andriani Tzoumi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER STRIKING AS DEFICIENT #9 Stipulation filed by Andriani Tzoumi - The stipulation of dismissal filed by plaintiff is STRICKEN as deficient. While signed by counsel for plaintiff, it has not been executed by defendant. A properly executed stipulation of dismissal shall be filed NO LATER THAN JULY 29, 2019. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/13/2019. (Irizarry, Dora) (Entered: 07/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION of Discontinuance Without Prejudice by Andriani Tzoumi (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ORDER re Order -- In addition to filing a stipulation of discontinuance by July 12, 2019 as directed by Chief Magistrate Judge Mann, the parties are to direct it to my attention for endorsement as the magistrate judge does not have authority to take dispositive action in a case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/2/2019. (Irizarry, Dora) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC ORDER re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Andriani Tzoumi. As an answer has been filed, a stipulation of discontinuance is needed to close the case. The parties shall file one by July 12, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/1/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andriani Tzoumi (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting in part #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The May 30th Initial Conference is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court and defendant, via ECF, by June 28, 2019, whether she will be discontinuing this action or seeking to have the initial conference rescheduled. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/29/2019. (Kelson, Lise) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Andriani Tzoumi. (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 5/30/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 5/16/2019. (Proujansky, Josh) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement) (Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Turkish Airlines, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Turkish Airlines, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11322826 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Andriani Tzoumi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lambrou, Lambros) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.