This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 08:50:21 (UTC).

Tyler v. Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Tyler filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Casualty Insurance CO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04300

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Michael L. Brown

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Tony Tyler

Atlanta, GA 30308

Defendant

Progressive Casualty Insurance CO.

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER for Service of #6 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/20. (jpa) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution under Local Rule 41.3(A)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/20. (jpa) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tony Tyler.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to either submit the fully completed application or pay the filing fees in this case by 11/30/20. Plaintiff is cautioned that the undersigned will recommend that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution if he does not comply with this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned on November 30, 2020, or when Plaintiff files a new application to proceed in forma pauperis or pays the filing fees, whichever occurs earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/16/20. (jpa) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to properly complete the application in its entirety and file the completed application with the Court by November II/ 2020. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned on November II/ 2020, or upon Plaintiff's filing of a completed application/ whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/21/20. (bjh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tony Tyler re #8 Notice (Other). (jpa) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tony Tyler re #6 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #7 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jpa) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER for Service of #6 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/20. (jpa) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #5 Complaint. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution under Local Rule 41.3(A)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/20. (jpa) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tony Tyler.(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 Order, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jpa) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tony Tyler re #4 Order (jpa) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing Plaintiff to either submit the fully completed application or pay the filing fees in this case by 11/30/20. Plaintiff is cautioned that the undersigned will recommend that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution if he does not comply with this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned on November 30, 2020, or when Plaintiff files a new application to proceed in forma pauperis or pays the filing fees, whichever occurs earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/16/20. (jpa) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of the #3 Order to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (aaq) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tony Tyler re #3 Order. (bjh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to properly complete the application in its entirety and file the completed application with the Court by November II/ 2020. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned on November II/ 2020, or upon Plaintiff's filing of a completed application/ whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/21/20. (bjh) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tony Tyler re #2 Order. (rvb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (rvb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Tyler. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less