This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 07:00:29 (UTC).

TYLER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 TYLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01558

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY L. TYLER

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of Plaintiff HENRY L. TYLER. (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#3

(#3) *** PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKETED IN ERROR*** ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 08/08/2022. (SNB) Modified on 8/8/2022 (NLR). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II and Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-1558-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge James R. Sweeney II and Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-1558-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *** PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKETED IN ERROR*** ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 08/08/2022. (SNB) Modified on 8/8/2022 (NLR). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of Plaintiff HENRY L. TYLER. (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, filed by HENRY L. TYLER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7223053) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer C. Rethemeier