This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:14:36 (UTC).

Two Rivers Pipeline and Construction Company, Inc. v. Cimarex Energy Co. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Two Rivers Pipeline and Construction Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cimarex Energy Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David B. Fannin and David Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David B. Fannin

Presiding Judge

David Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Two Rivers Pipeline and Construction Company, Inc.

3800 E. 42Nd Street, Suite 409

Odessa, TX 79762

Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc.,

Counter Plaintiffs and Defendants

Cimarex Energy Co.

Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey F. Thomason

Attorney at Todd, Barron,Thomason & Hudman, P.C.

3800 East 42Nd St., Suite 409

Odessa, TX 79762-5982

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Joe T. Sanders, II

Attorney at Sanders Bajwa LLP

919 Congress Avenue, Suite 750

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER:Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 05:00 PM in Pecos before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 08:00 AM in Pecos before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/21/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2020, Discovery due by 3/26/2020, Motions due by 4/26/2020,. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#8

(#8) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order by Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc.,. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc.,. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc., by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#4

(#4) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER to AMEND PLEADINGS - amended answer in compliance with the FederalRules of Civil Procedure within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12520694), filed by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER:Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 05:00 PM in Pecos before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/22/2020 08:00 AM in Pecos before Judge David Counts, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/21/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2020, Discovery due by 3/26/2020, Motions due by 4/26/2020,. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order by Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc.,. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc.,. (Thomason, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Two Rivers Pipeline & Construction Company, Inc., by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Cimarex Energy Co.. (Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to AMEND PLEADINGS - amended answer in compliance with the FederalRules of Civil Procedure within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12520694), filed by Resolute Natural Resources Company, LLC, Cimarex Energy Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Joe) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cimarex Energy Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey F. Thomason