This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 07:37:31 (UTC).

Twinrock Holdings, LLC v. CitiMortgage, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Twinrock Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CitiMortgage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer A. Dorsey and Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Twinrock Holdings, LLC

Defendants

CitiMortgage, Inc.

National Default Servicing Corporation

BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Henry Wright

Attorney at The Wright Law Group, P.C.

2340 Paseo Del Prado, Suite D-305

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Defendant Attorneys

David T. Blake

Attorney at Clear Counsel Law Group

50 S. Stephanie Street, Suite 101

Henderson, NV 89012

Krista Nielson

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Ste 220

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC by Plaintiff Twinrock Holdings, LLC. (Wright, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Twinrock Holdings, LLC. Adds new parties. (Wright, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#13

(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Blake, David) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

9 #10

Exhibit 10

9 #8

Exhibit 8

9 #6

Exhibit 6

9 #4

Exhibit 4

9 #9

Main Document

8 #15

Exhibit 15

8 #13

Exhibit 13

8 #9

Exhibit 9

8 #8

Main Document

4 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

4 #4

Main Document

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/25/2022. ORDER denying #4 moot Motion to Dismiss. In light of the filing of the amended complaint #14 , which supersedes the original complaint and moots the motion to dismiss it #4 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the original complaint #4 is DENIED without prejudice.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC by Plaintiff Twinrock Holdings, LLC. (Wright, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Twinrock Holdings, LLC. Adds new parties. (Wright, John) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Blake, David) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #8 Motion for TRO, by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. Replies due by 3/7/2022. (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Index of Recorded Documents) (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Twinrock Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Wright, John) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Twinrock Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Wright, John) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Twinrock Holdings, LLC. Replies due by 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Wright, John) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Compliance by CitiMortgage, Inc. re #2 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. Responses due by 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CitiMortgage, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CitiGroup, Inc. d/b/a CitiMortgage aka Citi for CitiMortgage, Inc. added. (Blake, David) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/27/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/11/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-846539-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6775131) by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blake, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRECKENRIDGE PROPERTY FUND 2016, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krista Nielson