This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 07:41:26 (UTC).

Twin Falls NSC, LLC v. Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Twin Falls NSC, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Twin Falls NSC, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

A. Dean Bennett

Attorney at HOLLAND AND HART LLP

Po Box 2527

Boise, ID 83701

Scott D Hess

Attorney at Holland & Hart, LLP

800 W. Main Street, Suite 1750, P.O. Box 2527

Boise, ID 83701

Russell S Baldwin

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims PLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Allison Wiseman Acker

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims PLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

W Brantley Phillips, Jr

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims PLC

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Angelo Luigi Rosa

2211 East Camelback Road, No. 302

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twin Falls NSC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmSurg Holdings, Inc. for Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC.. (Hess, Scott)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/6/2019. (cjs)

13 #1

Memorandum in Support of Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Countercla

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Counter Defendant Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Hess, Scott)

12 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

#12

(#12) MOTION to Confirm Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Hess, Scott)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award filed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Replies due by 3/7/2019.(Hess, Scott)

10 #20

Exhibit Exhibit 25

10 #19

Exhibit Exhibit 22

10 #18

Exhibit Exhibit 21

10 #17

Exhibit Exhibit 19

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award Angelo Luigi Rosa appearing for Defendant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Counter Claimant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rosa, Angelo)

8 #2

Summons Summons

8 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) COUNTERCLAIM Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award against Twin Falls NSC, LLC, filed by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Rosa, Angelo) Modified on 2/12/2019 to reflect Sealed Exhibits 9, 16, 20, 23, 24 & 31 on Disk lodged and placed in Clerk's Office file room (cjs).

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • (#17) A REQUEST TO REMAIN WITH A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(cjs) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#16) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Twin Falls NSC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AmSurg Holdings, Inc. for Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC.. (Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Twin Falls NSC, LLC Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 5/6/2019. (cjs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC, Counter Defendant Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Confirm Twin Falls NSC, LLC's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 3/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award filed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Replies due by 3/7/2019.(Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC re #8 Counterclaim, Notice of Lodging of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 29, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 30, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 33, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 34, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 35, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 36, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 37, #32 Exhibit Exhibit 38, #33 Exhibit Exhibit 39, #34 Exhibit Exhibit 40, #35 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #37 Exhibit Exhibit 43)(Rosa, Angelo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Seal Document #8 Counterclaim, Specific Exhibits to Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award Angelo Luigi Rosa appearing for Defendant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC, Counter Claimant Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Rosa, Angelo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) COUNTERCLAIM Counter-Petition to Vacate and/or Modify Arbitration Award against Twin Falls NSC, LLC, filed by Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Rosa, Angelo) Modified on 2/12/2019 to reflect Sealed Exhibits 9, 16, 20, 23, 24 & 31 on Disk lodged and placed in Clerk's Office file room (cjs).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 , #4 , & #5 Applications for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorneys W Brantley Phillips, Jr., Russell S Baldwin, & Allison Wiseman Acker for Twin Falls NSC LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by W. Brantley Phillips, Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839588.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Russell S. Baldwin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839580.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Allison Wiseman Acker. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1839563.)Scott D Hess appearing for Plaintiff Twin Falls NSC, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Application for Confirmation of Arbitration Award against Southern Idaho Ambulatory Surgery Center, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1832121.), filed by Twin Falls NSC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hess, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less