This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 05:08:52 (UTC).

Twin City Fire Insurance Company v. SLRA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company against SLRA Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06131

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Twin City Fire Insuracne Company

Defendants

SLRA Inc.

Scott M Landress

 

Court Documents

22 #7

Exhibit G - 2018-04-25 Clyde Ltr to BH

22 #6

Exhibit F - 2017-10-17 Troutman Response Ltr to BH

22 #5

Exhibit E - 2017-10-13 BH Reply Letter to Troutman

22 #4

Exhibit D - 2017-09-28 Troutman Ltr to BH

22 #3

Exhibit C - SEC Order

22 #2

Exhibit B - Twin City Policy

22 #1

Exhibit A - CNA Policy

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs bySLRA Inc., Scott M Landress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CNA Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Twin City Policy, #3 Exhibit C - SEC Order, #4 Exhibit D - 2017-09-28 Troutman Ltr to BH, #5 Exhibit E - 2017-10-13 BH Reply Letter to Troutman, #6 Exhibit F - 2017-10-17 Troutman Response Ltr to BH, #7 Exhibit G - 2018-04-25 Clyde Ltr to BH)(Collins, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#21

(#21) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott M Landress, SLRA Inc... (Collins, Richard) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#4

#Electronic filing error Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Summons cannot be issued in blank (no defendants or attorney info listed). This fili ng will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file completed form. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc., Ultimate Parent Corporation/Holding Company for Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Scott M Landress, SLRA Inc.. (Collins, Richard) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs bySLRA Inc., Scott M Landress. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CNA Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Twin City Policy, #3 Exhibit C - SEC Order, #4 Exhibit D - 2017-09-28 Troutman Ltr to BH, #5 Exhibit E - 2017-10-13 BH Reply Letter to Troutman, #6 Exhibit F - 2017-10-17 Troutman Response Ltr to BH, #7 Exhibit G - 2018-04-25 Clyde Ltr to BH)(Collins, Richard) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott M Landress, SLRA Inc... (Collins, Richard) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas Mangel. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gabriela Richeimer. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/13/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Scott M Landress, SLRA Inc.. (Collins, Richard) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twin City Fire Insurance Company.. (Miller, William) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (BY MAIL) (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Scott M Landress served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (Service by Substituted Service) (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Mangel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13752464.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/01/2019 filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Mangel, Douglas) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gabriela Richeimer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13752394.) filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Richeimer, Gabriela) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Summons. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error Re: #4 Proposed Summons filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Summons cannot be issued in blank (no defendants or attorney info listed). This fili ng will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file completed form. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/26/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group Inc., Ultimate Parent Corporation/Holding Company for Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Scott M Landress, SLRA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13741934.). Filed byTwin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B and C to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashton, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/27/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.