This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:31:44 (UTC).

Tweedy v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Tweedy filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl W. Hoffman and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00853

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carl W. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas G. Tweedy

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hal Taylor

223 Marsh Avenue

Reno, NV 89509

Defendant Attorney

Allison Jaime Cheung

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear St., Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) SCREENING ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk must file the Complaint and Issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Cheung, Allison) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/14/2019. (JQC) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5623181) by Plaintiff Douglas G. Tweedy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (0571-SSA, 0564-Atty General) re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (JM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Douglas G. Tweedy. Proof of service due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCREENING ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk must file the Complaint and Issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RFJ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Douglas G. Tweedy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Douglas G. Tweedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Summons AG, #5 Summons OGC, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less