This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:39:39 (UTC).

Tuttle v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Tuttle filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank D. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regina Tuttle

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George C. Piemonte

Attorney at Martin Jones & Piemonte

Po Box 669468

Charlotte, NC 28266-9468

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (tmg) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD062624 (js) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Fee due or Amended Application by 11/12/2020. (tmg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to file Amended Application or pay filing fee within 20 days. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/22/2020. (tmg) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Regina Tuttle. (Piemonte, George) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Regina Tuttle.(Piemonte, George) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less