This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 08:17:58 (UTC).

Tutor Perini Building Corp. v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Tutor Perini Building Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07845

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tutor Perini Building Corp.

Defendant

The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Geier

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Shana A. Elberg

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Patrick George Rideout

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-13196. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#7

6 #9

Exhibit 9 SDNY Order Affirming Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues

6 #8

Exhibit 8 SDNY Order Affirming Settlement Order

6 #7

Exhibit 7 Revised Order Approving the Settlement

6 #6

Exhibit 6 Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues

6 #5

Exhibit 5 Settlement agreement

6 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service

6 #3

Exhibit 3 - Complaint

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Standing Order

6 #6

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Rider A

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketUSBC-SDNY Case Number 21-1187 (DSJ)..(gp) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York..(gp) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-13196. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Patrick George Rideout to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the similar case information is on the wrong section of the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Patrick George Rideout to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): a pleading has already been accepted by the Court. If making any modifications, an Amended pleading must be filed or Court leave to file a Corrected pleading must be granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Related Case Statement, Notice of Appearance of Shana A. Elberg, and Jeffrey S. Geier on September 20, 2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NY Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 654898/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-25086623).Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Standing Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 Settlement agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues, #7 Exhibit 7 Revised Order Approving the Settlement, #8 Exhibit 8 SDNY Order Affirming Settlement Order, #9 Exhibit 9 SDNY Order Affirming Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues).(Rideout, Patrick) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Geier on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Geier, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shana A. Elberg on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Elberg, Shana) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-7257-AKH. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider A).(Rideout, Patrick) Modified on 9/21/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NY Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 654898/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25086322).Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Standing Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Settlement agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues, #7 Exhibit 7 - Revised Order Approving the Settlement, #8 Exhibit 8 - SDNY Order Affirming Settlement Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - SDNY Order Affirming Order Regarding Disputed Ground Lease Issues).(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Port Authority of New York and New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor Perini Corporation, a Massachusetts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick George Rideout

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shana Elberg