This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2019 at 07:21:24 (UTC).

Tutor Perini Building Corp. v. George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Tutor Perini Building Corp filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05344

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tutor Perini Building Corp.

Respondent

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Nida

Attorney at Nida & Romyn, P.C.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Emily Diane Anderson

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton, LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Gabriel Henriquez

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP (NYC)

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Ira Martin Schulman

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton, LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Respondent Attorneys

Patrick Thomas Murray, III

Attorney at Peckar & Abramson, P.C.,(NJ)

70 Grand Avenue, 2Nd Fl.

River Edge, NJ 07661

Gerard Joseph Onorata

Attorney at Peckar & Abramson

1325 Avenue Of The Americas, 10Th Fl., New York

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

RESTRICTED

#43

42 #1

Notice of Right to Appeal

#42

#41

#40

#39

#18

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Robert Nida

#1

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/15/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/15/2019 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gabriel Henriquez on behalf of Tutor Perini Building Corp.. New Address: Nida & Romyn, P.C., 1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 650, Los Angeles, California, United States of America 90067, 3102863400. (Henriquez, Gabriel) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #39 Order. in favor of Tutor Perini Building Corp. against George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated July 15, 2019, Petitioner's petition to confirm is granted; Respondent's cross-petition to vacate is denied, and Petitioner's motion to strike is denied as moot; judgment is entered in favor of Petitioner. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 07/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER terminating #40 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with the Court's July 15, 2019 order, but this case shall remain open on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/22/2019) (ne) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case /Request for Case to Remain Open addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ira M. Schulman dated July 19, 2019. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp..(Schulman, Ira) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp: For the reasons provided on the record after today's oral argument, Petitioner's petition to confirm is granted, Respondent's cross-petition to vacate is denied, and Petitioner's motion to strike is denied as moot. On the request of Respondent, the Court hereby stays the entry of this order for seven days, at which time the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate all pending motions, to enter judgment in favor of Petitioner, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/15/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Oral Argument held on 7/15/2019 re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp., #18 Response to Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (arc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support CROSS MOTION TO VACATE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD. Document filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture, LLC. (Onorata, Gerard) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER: On July 9, 2019, Respondent renewed its request for leave to file what it deemed to be a sur-reply to Petitioner's reply brief in further support of its petition to confirm. In reviewing the parties' submissions, it has become apparent to the Court that Petitioner's reply brief also served as its brief in opposition to Respondent's cross-petition to vacate. Respondent is thus entitled, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 6.1, to file a reply brief in further support of its cross-petition to vacate, without leave of Court. If Respondent wishes to file such a reply brief it shall do so no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 12, 2019. SO ORDERED., Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/11/2019) (rj) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Nida. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 190 (Contract: Other); Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 896 (Other Statutes: Arbitration); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Nida to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Signature of the Attorney of Record was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) FIRST BRIEF re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration, Confirm. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp..(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GEORGE WASHINGTON BRIDGE BUS STATION DEVELOPMENT VENTURE, LLC, re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp.. (Nida, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nida, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tutor Perini Corporation for Tutor Perini Building Corp.. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp..(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17036919).Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Nida, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor Perini Corporation, a Massachusetts Corporation is a litigant