This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:05:45 (UTC).

Turtle Island Foods SPC v. Soman

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Turtle Island Foods SPC filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Soman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Turtle Island Foods SPC

Turtle Island Foods SPC doing business as Tofurky Company

Defendant

Nikhil Soman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Ryan Priebe

Attorney at James Carter & Priebe, LLP

Post Office Box 907

Little Rock, AR 72203

Brian Hauss

Attorney at ACLU Foundation

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Matthew Glen Liebman

Attorney at Animal Legal Defense Fund

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Jessica Almy

Attorney at The Good Food Institute

1380 Monroe Street Northwest, Suite 229

Washington, DC 20010

Amanda M Howell

Attorney at Animal Legal Defense Fund

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Amanda M. Howell

Attorney at Animal Legal Defense Fund

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Nicole D. Manu

Attorney at The Good Food Institute

1380 Monroe Street Northwest, Suite 229

Washington, DC 20010

Defendant Attorney

Jerry D. Garner

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF HEARING and ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on #14 the request for preliminary injunction on Monday, 10/7/2019, beginning at 9 a.m. C.T. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas, Room No. 4C. The evidentiary record with respect to the motion for preliminary injunction will close at the conclusion of the 10/7/2019, hearing. If the parties wish to file supplemental briefings following the hearing, such simultaneous briefings are due by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 10/14/2019. The Court also directs the parties to exchange exhibits they intend to present and written lists of witnesses they will or may call at the preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 9/30/2019. If the parties wish to present rebuttal exhibits or witnesses at the hearing, the parties shall submit such rebuttal exhibits and written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Wednesday, 10/2/2019. If any party objects to the Courts consideration of exhibits already in the record in this matter, such objections must be made in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Thursday, 10/3/2019, and any responses to such objections must be in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T., on Friday, 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 to correct description. (kbc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

17 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Nikhil Soman

17 #1

Exhibit Act 501

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nikhil Soman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Act 501, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Nikhil Soman)(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

14 #3

Ex 3 Misenheimer Declaration

14 #2

Ex 2 Only Declaration

14 #1

Ex 1 Athos Declaration

#14

(#14) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 Athos Declaration, #2 Ex 2 Only Declaration, #3 Ex 3 Misenheimer Declaration)(Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#7

(#7) BRIEF SUPPORTING Motion Seeking Leave to file Concurrently Mailed Amicus Reply as an Interested Party "IFP" re #6 Motion for Leave to File filed by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jap) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

6 #1

Document proposed amicus reply

#6

(#7) BRIEF SUPPORTING Motion Seeking Leave to file Concurrently Mailed Amicus Reply as an Interested Party "IFP" re #6 Motion for Leave to File filed by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jap) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#5

(#18) ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. Nikhil Soman served on 7/23/2019. (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#18) ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#2

(#18) ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nikhil Soman.(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #19 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description to "Notice of Hearing and Order", as indicated on the document. (kbc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF HEARING and ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on #14 the request for preliminary injunction on Monday, 10/7/2019, beginning at 9 a.m. C.T. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas, Room No. 4C. The evidentiary record with respect to the motion for preliminary injunction will close at the conclusion of the 10/7/2019, hearing. If the parties wish to file supplemental briefings following the hearing, such simultaneous briefings are due by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 10/14/2019. The Court also directs the parties to exchange exhibits they intend to present and written lists of witnesses they will or may call at the preliminary injunction hearing by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Monday, 9/30/2019. If the parties wish to present rebuttal exhibits or witnesses at the hearing, the parties shall submit such rebuttal exhibits and written lists of such rebuttal witnesses by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Wednesday, 10/2/2019. If any party objects to the Courts consideration of exhibits already in the record in this matter, such objections must be made in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T. on Thursday, 10/3/2019, and any responses to such objections must be in writing and filed by 5:00 p.m. C.T., on Friday, 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) Docket text modified on 8/30/2019 to correct description. (kbc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #2 #3 #5 #9 #10 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Brian Hauss, Jessica Almy, Nicole Manu, Amanda Howell, and Matthew Liebman. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nikhil Soman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Act 501, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Nikhil Soman)(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Filing Exhibit 4 on DVD of the following: 2/27/19 Hearing of the Agriculture, Forestry & Economic Development Committee of the Arkansas House of Representatives concerning House Bill 1407; the March 4, 2019 floor session presentation of House Bill 1407 to the Arkansas House of Representatives; the March 13, 2019 floor presentation of House Bill 1407 to the Arkansas Senate. by Turtle Island Foods SPC re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (jap) [Exhibit 4 is maintained in the Clerk's Office files] (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 Athos Declaration, #2 Ex 2 Only Declaration, #3 Ex 3 Misenheimer Declaration)(Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nikhil Soman.(Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry D. Garner on behalf of Nikhil Soman (Garner, Jerry) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service on Arkansas Attorney General of Notice of Constitutional Challenge of Statute by Turtle Island Foods SPC. (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Matthew Liebman. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3512728. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Amanda Howell. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3512714. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Turtle Island Foods SPC of Constitutional Challenge of Statute (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BRIEF SUPPORTING Motion Seeking Leave to file Concurrently Mailed Amicus Reply as an Interested Party "IFP" re #6 Motion for Leave to File filed by Curtis J Neeley, Jr. (jap) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION Seeking Leave to File Attached Amicus Reply as a Interested Party "IFP" by Curtis J Neeley, Jr (Attachments: #1 Document proposed amicus reply)(jap) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicole Manu. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3505886. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. Nikhil Soman served on 7/23/2019. (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jessica Almy. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502584. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Brian Hauss. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502572. Filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC (Priebe, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Nikhil Soman, filed by Turtle Island Foods SPC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073114.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Turtle Island Foods, SPC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry D Garner