This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 07:58:48 (UTC).

Turnipseed v. Aramark Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Turnipseed filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Aramark Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert L Miller, Jr and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00108

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barney D. Turnipseed

Portage, IN 46368

Defendants

Aramark Correctional Services LLC

Aramark Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin C Clay

Attorney at Curlin & Clay Law

8510 Evergreen Ave Ste 200

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

Philip G Rizzo

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Mer/IN

233 E 84Th Dr Ste 201

Merrillville, IN 46410

Michael A Kreppein

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Mer/IN

233 E 84Th Dr Ste 201

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aramark Correctional Services LLC. (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Kreppein on behalf of Aramark Correctional Services LLC (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip G Rizzo on behalf of Aramark Correctional Services LLC (Rizzo, Philip) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Aramark Corporation. (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Aramark Corporation. The Court EXTENDS Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading in this matter to 3/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/17/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robin C Clay on behalf of Barney D. Turnipseed (Clay, Robin) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Aramark Corporation.(Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/19/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2022 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/29/22. (slm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#11

(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/19/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2022 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/29/22. (slm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Aramark Corporation.(Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robin C Clay on behalf of Barney D. Turnipseed (Clay, Robin) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Aramark Corporation. The Court EXTENDS Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading in this matter to 3/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/17/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendant Aramark Corporation. (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip G Rizzo on behalf of Aramark Correctional Services LLC (Rizzo, Philip) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Kreppein on behalf of Aramark Correctional Services LLC (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aramark Correctional Services LLC. (Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4828033.) from LaPorte County Circuit Court, Cause No. 46C01-2201-CT-000003, filed by Aramark Correctional Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreppein, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aramark Correctional Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aramark Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Kreppein