This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:46:06 (UTC).

Turner v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Turner filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04476

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Turner

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Wright Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J Robert Bell, III

Attorney at Osborne & Francis, PLLC

433 Plaza Realsuite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Joseph A. Osborne

Attorney at Osborne & Associates Law Firm, P.A.

Suite 271433 Plaza Real

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Richard R. Schlueter

Attorney at Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Suite 1001932 North Druid Hills Road

Atlanta, GA 30319

Charles Andrew Childers

Attorney at Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Suite 1001932 North Druid Hills Road

Atlanta, GA 30319

Douglass A. Kreis

Attorney at Aylstock, Witkin, Kreis & Overholtz, PLLC

Suite 20017 E. Main Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorney

Alice E. Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Nesuite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answers due 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. (jpa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#15

RESTRICTED

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

5 #1

Wright Medical Group, Inc.

#5

(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Wright Medical Group, Inc.)(jpa) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglass Alan Kreis. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/3/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255). Attorney Douglass A. Kreis added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (gas) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION for Admission of Douglass Alan Kreis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11424255).by Heather Turner. (Schlueter, Richard) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Robert Bell, III re #16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jpa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Robert Bell, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Answers due 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. (jpa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Anthony Osborne. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/29/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Alice E. Snedeker on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Anthony Osborne Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11413195).. Attorney Joseph A. Osborne added appearing on behalf of Heather Turner (nmb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Douglass A. Kreis. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to J Robert Bell, III. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joseph A. Osborne. Clerk to follow-up by 11/29/2021. (nmb) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Heather Turner. Wright Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Wright Medical Group, Inc.)(jpa) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Heather Turner (Childers, Charles) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Heather Turner. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11358207) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alice Egan Snedeker