This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 09:39:25 (UTC).

Stephen Turner v. The Bicycle Casino, L.P.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Stephen Turner filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Bicycle Casino, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05659

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Turner

Defendant

The Bicycle Casino, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela Tsao

Attorney at Ascension Law Group

12341 Newport Avenue Suite B200

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S Menzie

Attorney at CAF Law Group

8444 Wilshire Boulevard 8Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Carla J Feldman

Attorney at CAF Law Group

8444 Wilshire Boulevard 8Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

15 #4

Exhibit A to Declaration of Pamela Tsao

15 #3

Declaration Declaration of Pamela Tsao

15 #2

Exhibit A to Turner Declaration

15 #1

Declaration Declaration of Stephen Turner

15 #15

Main Document

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit A

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendant The Bicycle Casino, L.P..(Attorney Carla J Feldman added to party The Bicycle Casino, L.P.(pty:dft))(Feldman, Carla) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2021.) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has reviewed the Response filed by plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel to the Court's Order to Show Cause. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's Unruh Act and any other construction-related accessibility claim. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(4). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Stephen Turnerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Turner, #2 Exhibit A to Turner Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Pamela Tsao, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Pamela Tsao)(Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Stephen Turner, upon Defendant The Bicycle Casino, L.P. served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Norma Casena - Human Resource in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is denied by District Judge Percy Anderson. This case shall remain assigned to the District Judge. (rn) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of and alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. 12010-12213, and a claim for damages pursuant to California's Unruh Civil Rights Act ("Unruh Act"), Cal. Civ. Code 51-53. It appears that the Court possesses only supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim, and any other state law claim that plaintiff may have alleged, pursuant to the Court's supplemental jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1367(a). Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than July 28, 2021. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Bicycle Casino, L.P. (lh) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Stephen Turner. (Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Stephen Turner, (Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stephen Turner. (Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31621479 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Stephen Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1) (Attorney Pamela Tsao added to party Stephen Turner(pty:pla))(Tsao, Pamela) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant