Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2020 at 09:59:05 (UTC).

Turner v. Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Turner filed an Other lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11530

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Turner

Defendants

Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan

Liberty Mutual Group Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Medical Plan

Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board

Does 1-50, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeff C. Chang

Attorney at Chang Law Group LLC

100 State Street, 11Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Alex M. Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Jack B Winters, Jr.

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Craig M Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret H. Warner

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Shamis N. Beckley

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

200 Clarendon Street

Boston, MA 02116-5021

Dmitriy Tishyevich

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

Richard Diggs

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

340 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10173

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Diggs

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Diggs Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427465 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Diggs)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dmitriy Tishyevich

#12

(#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dmitriy Tishyevich Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427456 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dmitriy Tishyevich)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Margaret H. Warner

#11

(#11) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Margaret H. Warner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427328 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Margaret H. Warner)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2020 to File Answer or other response to the Complaint by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board.(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Shamis N. Beckley on behalf of Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board (Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

6 #2

Affidavit Winters Affidavit

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jack B. Winters, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417900 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Winters Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

5 #2

Affidavit Tomasevic Affidavit

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alex M. Tomasevic Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417888 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Tomasevic Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

4 #2

Affidavit Nicholas Affidavit

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Craig M. Nicholas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417715 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Nicholas Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added RICHARD DIGGS. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added RICHARD DIGGS. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added RICHARD DIGGS. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board Answer or other response to the Complaint due by 11/9/2020. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Diggs Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427465 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Richard Diggs)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dmitriy Tishyevich Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427456 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dmitriy Tishyevich)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Margaret H. Warner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8427328 by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Margaret H. Warner)(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2020 to File Answer or other response to the Complaint by Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board.(Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board. (Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Shamis N. Beckley on behalf of Does 1-50, Inclusive, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Medical Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan Retirement Board (Beckley, Shamis) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jack B. Winters, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jack B. Winters, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jack B. Winters, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jack B. Winters, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417900 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Winters Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alex M. Tomasevic Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417888 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Tomasevic Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Craig M. Nicholas Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8417715 by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Nicholas Affidavit)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8374483 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Chang, Jeff) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack B. Winters, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Michael Tomasevic