Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 07:14:25 (UTC).

Turner v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Turner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00592

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Lynn Turner

Defendant

GEICO Advantage Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carl R Houston

Attorney at Las Vegas Personal Injury, PLLC

517 S. 3Rd Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Ramzy P Ladah

Attorney at Las Vegas Personal Injury, PLLC

517 S. 3Rd Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew John Douglas

Attorney at Winner & Sherrod

1117 South Rancho

Las Vegas, NV 89102

Thomas E. Winner

Attorney at Winner & Sherrod

1117 South Rancho Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89102

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/27/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Douglas, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-831201-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6443513) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Douglas, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/27/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Douglas, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-831201-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6443513) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Douglas, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geico Advantage Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramzy P Ladah