This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2021 at 10:04:59 (UTC).

Turner v. Family Security Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 07/02/2021 Turner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Family Security Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01925

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Turner

Dinah Turner

Defendants

Family Security Insurance Company

Family Security Insurance Co

Family Security Insurance Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron Sean Snowden

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc

1415 Louisiana St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Michael S Barcus

Attorney at McClenny Moseley & Assoc

1415 Louisiana St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher K Jones

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Virginia J McLin

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/16/2021. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/26/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Family Security Insurance Co Inc.(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to add docket entry relationship and edit docket text on 8/26/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Family Security Insurance Co Inc filed by Thomas Turner, Dinah Turner.(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/16/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

10 #1

Proposed order Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amend C

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent by Thomas Turner. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amend Complaint)(aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Cameron Sean Snowden on behalf of Thomas Turner regarding #8 Amended Complaint. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this amended pleading. If this filing is one to which a responsive pleading is required, leave of court is required to file 21 days after service of the response or a motion under Rule 12(b)(e)(3) or (f). Other amendments require consent or leave of court. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a) for further information regarding requirements for amendment of pleadings. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint against Family Security Insurance Co Inc filed by Thomas Turner.(aty,Snowden, Cameron) Modified to reflect deficient status on 8/10/2021 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate document is proposed on 8/13/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Family Security Insurance Co Inc answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/4/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for Family Security Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

5 #1

Proposed order

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Family Security Insurance Co Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party Family Security Insurance Co (pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to correct filer on 8/4/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Turner. Family Security Insurance Co served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint against Family Security Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4726608) filed by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Cameron Sean Snowden added to party Thomas Turner(pty:pla))(aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/16/2021. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/26/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Family Security Insurance Co Inc.(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to add docket entry relationship and edit docket text on 8/26/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Family Security Insurance Co Inc filed by Thomas Turner, Dinah Turner.(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/16/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, with consent by Thomas Turner. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amend Complaint)(aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Cameron Sean Snowden on behalf of Thomas Turner regarding #8 Amended Complaint. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this amended pleading. If this filing is one to which a responsive pleading is required, leave of court is required to file 21 days after service of the response or a motion under Rule 12(b)(e)(3) or (f). Other amendments require consent or leave of court. Please refer to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a) for further information regarding requirements for amendment of pleadings. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint against Family Security Insurance Co Inc filed by Thomas Turner.(aty,Snowden, Cameron) Modified to reflect deficient status on 8/10/2021 (Thomas, T). Modified to indicate document is proposed on 8/13/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Family Security Insurance Co Inc answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/4/2021. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for Family Security Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Family Security Insurance Co Inc. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party Family Security Insurance Co (pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to correct filer on 8/4/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Turner. Family Security Insurance Co served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) (ELECTRONICALLY ISSUED IN ERROR) - SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 7/6/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint against Family Security Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4726608) filed by Thomas Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Cameron Sean Snowden added to party Thomas Turner(pty:pla))(aty,Snowden, Cameron) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cole Cisco Frazier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher K. Jones