This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:25:45 (UTC).

Turner v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Turner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald C. Nugent and James R. Knepp, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01626

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C. Nugent

Referral Judge

James R. Knepp, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taira Turner

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine M. Braun

Attorney at Kordic & Braun

820 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant Attorneys

Social Security Administration - Chicago

Lynne H. Buck

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/24/2020. (S,JM) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Commissioner of Social Security on 7/31/2020, Unsigned, marked C-19, Office of the U.S. Attorney on 7/31/2020, Unsigned, marked C-19 and U.S. Attorney General on 7/31/2020 filed on behalf of Taira Turner. Related document(s) #6 . (S,DM) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/24/2020. (S,JM) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/23/2020. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketJudge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Compliance filed by Taira Turner. (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Taira Turner. (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Taira Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Appeals Council denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less