This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:13:54 (UTC).

Turner v. Casey's General Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Turner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Casey's General Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Broomes and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John W. Broomes

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Turner

Defendants

Casey's Retail Company

Casey's General Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger Fincher

Attorney at Fincher Law Office

1263 Sw Topeka Blvd.

Topeka, KS 66612

Defendant Attorney

Schalie A. Johnson

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 West 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Schalie A. Johnson on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court Greenwood County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000007 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4718211.), filed by Casey's Retail Company, Casey's General Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's General Stores, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 7/10/2019. Discovery deadline 10/10/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 12/2/2019. Estimated trial time 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/10/19. (ss) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's Retail Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Michelle Turner. (Fincher, Roger) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Petition) by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company.(Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#16

(#16) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 4/16/2019. (mam) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 1:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/1/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/1/2019. All parties must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/27/19. (ss) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER - Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 4/16/2019. (mam) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 7/10/2019. Discovery deadline 10/10/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 12/2/2019. Estimated trial time 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/10/19. (ss) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • (#14) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/10/2019.(AT&T Conference Line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Michelle Turner. (Fincher, Roger) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 at 1:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/1/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/1/2019. All parties must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/27/19. (ss) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's Retail Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Casey's General Stores, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Petition) by Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company.(Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Schalie A. Johnson on behalf of Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Casey's General Stores, Inc., Casey's Retail Company. (Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court Greenwood County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000007 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4718211.), filed by Casey's Retail Company, Casey's General Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Schalie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.