This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 09:55:49 (UTC).

Turley v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Turley filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05050

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sallye Turley

Defendant

Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon W. Lacy

Attorney at Lacy Law Firm

630 S. Main Street

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Defendant Attorney

Troy A. Price

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings LLP

200 W. Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. Stipulated Record is due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 18, 2020. (jas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company.(Price, Troy) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Letter acknowledging due date

#8

(#8) MOTION for Order Establishing Due Date for Responsive Pleading by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter acknowledging due date)(Price, Troy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Price on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sallye Turley. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#5

(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (tg). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

2 #10

Exhibit 10, LLF followup ltr

2 #9

Exhibit 9, LLF ltr of rep

2 #8

Exhibit 8, Ltr from Anthem

2 #7

Exhibit 7, Ltr from doctor

2 #6

Exhibit 6, External Review Determination

2 #5

Exhibit 5, Nurses Attempts

2 #4

Exhibit 4, Ltr from Turley

2 #3

Exhibit 3, Ltr from Anthem

2 #2

Exhibit 2, Clinical UM Guideline

2 #1

Exhibit 1, Ltr from Anthem

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2106652), filed by Sallye Turley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Ltr from Anthem, #2 Exhibit 2, Clinical UM Guideline, #3 Exhibit 3, Ltr from Anthem, #4 Exhibit 4, Ltr from Turley, #5 Exhibit 5, Nurses Attempts, #6 Exhibit 6, External Review Determination, #7 Exhibit 7, Ltr from doctor, #8 Exhibit 8, Ltr from Anthem, #9 Exhibit 9, LLF ltr of rep, #10 Exhibit 10, LLF followup ltr)(Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. Stipulated Record is due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 18, 2020. (jas) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company.(Price, Troy) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion. The deadline for Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company to answer or respond to the complaint is May 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 24, 2020. (rab) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Order Establishing Due Date for Responsive Pleading by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter acknowledging due date)(Price, Troy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Price on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company. (Price, Troy) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sallye Turley. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (tg). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,,. (Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2106652), filed by Sallye Turley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Ltr from Anthem, #2 Exhibit 2, Clinical UM Guideline, #3 Exhibit 3, Ltr from Anthem, #4 Exhibit 4, Ltr from Turley, #5 Exhibit 5, Nurses Attempts, #6 Exhibit 6, External Review Determination, #7 Exhibit 7, Ltr from doctor, #8 Exhibit 8, Ltr from Anthem, #9 Exhibit 9, LLF ltr of rep, #10 Exhibit 10, LLF followup ltr)(Lacy, Brandon) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sallye Turley. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less