This case was last updated from PACER on 05/16/2020 at 11:25:06 (UTC).

Turley v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Turley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00279

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Turley

Defendants

Underwriters at Lloyds London

American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James F. Swindoll

Attorney at Law Offices of James F. Swindoll

212 Center Street, Suite 300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew King

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2000

Little Rock, AR 72201-3740

McKenzie L. Raub

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

124 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2000

Little Rock, AR 72201-3740

Samantha R. Wilson

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Michael Bailey Heister

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Underwriters at Lloyds London's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#16

(#16) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

15 #4

Exhibit 4

15 #3

Exhibit 3

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Underwriters at Lloyds London (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#14

(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Underwriters at Lloyds London (King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Underwriters at Lloyds London.(King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha R. Wilson on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Turley. (jbh) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Underwriters at Lloyds London's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Underwriters at Lloyds London (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(King, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Underwriters at Lloyds London (King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Underwriters at Lloyds London.(King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha R. Wilson on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Wilson, Samantha) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bailey Heister on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida (Heister, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of Underwriters at Lloyds London (King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by McKenzie L. Raub on behalf of Underwriters at Lloyds London (Raub, McKenzie) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPLY re #1 Notice of Removal Consent to Removal by Underwriters at Lloyds London. (King, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 5/26/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/8/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 3/17/20. (mmb) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Turley. (jbh) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-20-01340. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT076504. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.