This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2021 at 09:48:32 (UTC).

Turkewitz et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Turkewitz filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen Turkewitz

Katherine Turkewitz

Defendants

Stryker Sales, LLC

Howmedica Osteonics Corp. doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics

Stryker Corporation

Stryker Sales Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M Knowles

Attorney at KnowlesLaw Firm, PC

768 St. Andrews Blvd

Charleston, SC 29412

Bruce D Fox

Attorney at Fox & Farley

310 North Main Street

Clinton, TN 37716

John A Willis

Attorney at Fox Willis Burnette, PLLC

310 N Main Street

Clinton, TN 37716-3752

Robert M Turkewitz

Attorney at Law Office of Robert M. Turkewitz, LLC

768 St. Andrews Blvd

Charleston, SC 29412

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey William Sheehan

Attorney at Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP (Nashville)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700

Nashville, TN 37203

Shundra Crumpton Manning

Attorney at Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings LLP (Nashville)

1600 Division Street, Suite 700

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Stryker Sales LLC

1 #2

Summons Stryker Corporation

1 #1

Summons Howmedica Ostenoics Corporation

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2021 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in instructions will be circulated via email. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 09/01/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/31/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Sheehan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) [DISREGARD ENTRY. ATTORNEY IS ADMITTED AS SHUNDRA CRUMPTON MANNING] NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Shundra C. Manning is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (JBR) Modified on 8/10/2021 (JBR). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Sheehan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Turkewitz, Katherine Turkewitz. Stryker Corporation served on 7/19/2021. (Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Turkewitz, Katherine Turkewitz. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served on 7/19/2021. (Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Turkewitz, Katherine Turkewitz. Stryker Sales, LLC served on 7/23/2021. (Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 7/21/2021. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Attorneys Knowles and Turkewitz on 7/23/2021 (JBR). (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Turkewitz ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4791227.) filed by Katherine Turkewitz, Stephen Turkewitz, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Knowles ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4791215.) filed by Katherine Turkewitz, Stephen Turkewitz (JBR) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Knowles ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4791215.) by Katherine Turkewitz, Stephen Turkewitz. (Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Stryker Corporation, #2 Summons Stryker Sales, LLC)(JBR) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, amended civil cover sheet by Katherine Turkewitz, Stephen Turkewitz. (Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 07/08/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 07/08/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 07/08/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file a signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Complaint, Doc. 1. Requirements due by 7/13/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac): Attorneys Robert Turkewitz and Brian Knowles are not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Robert Turkewitz and Brian Knowles) (AMP) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4782112.), filed by Stephen A Turkewitz, Katherine Turkewitz. (Attachments: #1 Summons Howmedica Ostenoics Corporation, #2 Summons Stryker Corporation, #3 Summons Stryker Sales LLC, #4 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Fox, Bruce) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stryker Sales Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Marc Turkewitz