This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2020 at 11:29:06 (UTC).

Turk et al v. Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2020 Turk filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Morris, Manning Martin, LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02815

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Norman Radow

William N. Turk

Defendants

Conservation Pays, LLC

Lucus Mason, Inc.

Environmental Research and Mapping Facility, LLC

Blethen Mine Consultants, LLC

Conservation Matters, LLC

Weibel and Associates, Inc.

Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.

Clay Weibel

Carlton Walstad

Large & Gilbert, Inc.

The Georgia Tuition Assistance Program, Inc.

Ornstein-Schuler Investments LLC

Donald R. Sklar

Robert D. Keller

Timothy Pollock

Ornstein-Schuler Capital Partners LLC

The National Wild Turkey Federation Research Foundation, Inc.

Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Jon Rappaport

Attorney at Saylor Law Firm LLP

1201 W Peachtree Street, Suite 3220

Atlanta, GA 30309

William Ralph Canada, Jr.

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

David R. Deary

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Jeven R. Sloan

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Donna Lee

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Jim L. Flegle

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Tyler McLean Simpson

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

John William McKenzie, III

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Joseph Rollins

Attorney at Smith, Gambrel & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 3100, Promenade

Atlanta, GA 30309-3592

Jason S. Bell

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell, LLP - GA

Suite 3100, Promenade, 1230 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3592

Steven Anthony Vickery

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory Keith Smith

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3100

Atlanta, GA 30309

David M. Pernini

Attorney at Wargo & French LLP

999 Peachtree Street, Ne, 26Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Donald Brown

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

William Dowdy White

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC

191 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

D. Michael Williams

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, P.C.-ATL

Suite 2900, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Natasha Sara-Lorraine Banks

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

55 Ivan Allen Jr. Blvd., Nw, Suite 750

Atlanta, GA 30308

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sully Mansukhani, LLP - SC

Suite 350, 40 Calhoun Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Other Attorneys

Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.

Attorney at S. Fenn Little, Jr. P.C.

1490 Mecaslin Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Travis Martin Cashbaugh

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

100 Galleria Parkway Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#102

101 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting extension

#101

100 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - 2020-08-06 Notice of Intent to Withdraw

#100

#99

#98

93 #1

Exhibit PROPOSED Scheduling Order

#93

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Donald R. Sklar and Partnership Tax Solutions, Inc. shall file any motion or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/28/2020. (jpk) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #101 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rjs) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Partnership Tax Solutions, Inc., Donald R. Sklar. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting extension)(Brown, Donald) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) MOTION to Withdraw Jeffrey William Melcher as Attorneyby Large & Gilbert, Inc. and Conservation Pays, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2020-08-06 Notice of Intent to Withdraw)(Melcher, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/24/2020 to add filer(bnp). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 8/19/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Conservation Saves, LLC, Galt Mining Investments, LLC, Ornstein-Schuler Capital Partners LLC, and Ornstein-Schuler Investments LLC Answers due 10/16/2020. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/18/20. (hfm) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #93 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Martin Cashbaugh on behalf of Bennett Thrasher, LLC (Cashbaugh, Travis) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kristin Maine on behalf of Bennett Thrasher, LLC (Maine, Dana) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) CERTIFICATE of Compliance Heather N. Fugitt (Fugitt, Heather) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Environmental Research and Mapping Facility, LLC (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Atlantic Coast Conservancy Properties, LLC (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Joseph C. Skalski (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Conservation Pays, LLC (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Timothy Pollock (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Norman Radow, Carlita B. Turk, William N. Turk to Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP (Sloan, Jeven) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by William N. Turk, Carlita B. Turk and Norman Radow. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9873398) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/7/2020 to add filer (eop). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.