This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2020 at 11:38:19 (UTC).

Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Turek Enterprises, Inc , d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas L. Ludington and Patricia T. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11655

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Ludington

Referral Judge

Patricia T. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer M. Grieco

Attorney at Altior Law, P.C.

401 S. Old Woodward, Suite 460

Birmingham, MI 48009

Stephen T. McKenney

Attorney at Altior Law, P.C.

401 S. Old Woodward, Ste. 460

Birmingham, MI 48009

Kenneth F. Neuman

Attorney at Altior Law, P.C.

401 South Old Woodward, Suite 460

Birmingham, MI 48009

Robert B. Sickels

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Jason J. Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Andrew Kochanowski

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorneys

Paul D. Hudson

Attorney at Miller, Canfield, Paddock & Stone, P.L.C.

277 S. Rose Street, Suite 5000

Kalamazoo, MI 49007

Thomas W. Cranmer

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock and Stone PLC

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

Matthew P. Allen

Attorney at Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, PLC

840 West Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Sickels on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sickels, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kochanowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

16 #4

Exhibit 3 - Governor Whitmer EO 2020-21

16 #3

Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy

16 #2

Exhibit 1 - Studio 417 v Cincinnati Insurance

16 #1

Index of Exhibits

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Studio 417 v Cincinnati Insurance, #3 Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Governor Whitmer EO 2020-21) (McKenney, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#15

(#15) Order Accepting Stipulation in Part and Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant' #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Response due by 8/12/2020.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Thompson on behalf of Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (Thompson, Jason) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

12 #5

Exhibit C to Declaration

12 #4

Exhibit B to Declaration

12 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration

12 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Matt Allen

12 #1

Index of Exhibits

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matt Allen, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration) (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Hudson on behalf of All Defendants. (Hudson, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of All Defendants. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Sickels on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sickels, Robert) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kochanowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kochanowski, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Studio 417 v Cincinnati Insurance, #3 Exhibit 2 - Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Governor Whitmer EO 2020-21) (McKenney, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Order Accepting Stipulation in Part and Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant' #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Response due by 8/12/2020.) Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J. Thompson on behalf of Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (Thompson, Jason) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Matt Allen, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration) (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Hudson on behalf of All Defendants. (Hudson, Paul) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of All Defendants. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Cranmer on behalf of All Defendants. (Cranmer, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Grieco, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Grieco, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Grieco, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. McKenney on behalf of Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (McKenney, Stephen) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Grieco on behalf of Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic. (Grieco, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company* (SKra) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *State Farm Fire and Casualty Company* (SKra) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT [CLASS ACTION] filed by Turek Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Alcona Chiropractic against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7882087 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Alcona County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Alcona County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: McLean County, IL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District of Michigan, 20-cv-11384, Judge Matthew F. Leitman] (Neuman, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less