This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 20:44:09 (UTC).

Turcotte v. Global Refining Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Turcotte filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Global Refining Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09182

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Turcotte doing business as Premium Catalytic Converter Refining

Defendant

Global Refining Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nels T. Lippert

Attorney at Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Phillip Braginsky

Attorney at Tarter Krinsky & Drogin

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Brittany Kate Lazzaro

Attorney at Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP

1350 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Evan Lewis

Attorney at Lewis & Lin, LLC

77 Sands Street, Ste 6Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Justin Harry Ryann Mercer

Attorney at Lewis & Lin, LLC

77 Sands Street, Ste 6Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Robert Powers

Attorney at McClanahan Powers, PLLC

3160 Fairview Park Drive, Suite 410

Falls Church, VA 22042

 

Court Documents

#68

(#68) ORDER granting #67 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference scheduled for June 21, 2022 is adjourned to July 7 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 67. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/15/2022) (va) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#67

(#67) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for June 21, 2022 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nels T. Lippert dated June 15, 2022. Document filed by Robert Turcotte..(Lippert, Nels) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#65

(#65) STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/6/2022) (rro) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

64 #2

Blackline

64 #1

Text of Proposed Order

64 #64

Main Document

#63

(#63) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties expect that this case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 1, 2022. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by June 1, 2022. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than June 1, 2022. Motions for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed no later than August 1, 2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 days. The Court will hold a status conference on July 19, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. by telephone. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/1/2022. Depositions due by 6/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Telephone Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 4:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/10/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#62

(#62) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/24/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#61

(#61) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/24/2022 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Global Refining Group, Inc..(Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franklin Powers on behalf of Global Refining Group, Inc. (Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

Notice of Correction re: #4 Affidavit of Service; Clerk spoke with filing attorney in regards to the service date. The correct event is "Summons Returned Executed" which will generate an answer due date of March 30, 2021. Clerk will correct the docket text and set the answer due date. No further action is required at this time. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Global Refining Group, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Robert Turcotte. (Doner, Karen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER granting #67 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference scheduled for June 21, 2022 is adjourned to July 7 at 4:30 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 67. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/15/2022) (va) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for June 21, 2022 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nels T. Lippert dated June 15, 2022. Document filed by Robert Turcotte..(Lippert, Nels) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#66) ORDER. The Court will hold a conference by telephone on June 21, 2022 at 4 p.m. for the purpose of scheduling a joint bench trial. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/6/2022) (rro) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Robert Turcotte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Blackline).(Lippert, Nels) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 3/10/2022. (Court Reporter present) (wv) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties expect that this case is not to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 1, 2022. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by June 1, 2022. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than June 1, 2022. Motions for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed no later than August 1, 2022. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 days. The Court will hold a status conference on July 19, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. by telephone. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/1/2022. Depositions due by 6/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2022. Telephone Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 4:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/10/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/24/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/24/2022 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2022..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter filed by Robert Turcotte. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the parties' request that a case management plan be entered in this case, the parties are hereby ORDERED to submit via email (WoodsNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov) a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in PDF format on or before March 7, 2022 in anticipation of the status conference scheduled for March 10, 2022. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order available at the Court's website (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hongregory-h-woods). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/4/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin Mercer and Certification of Local Counsel Robert Powers Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7758897. by Global Refining Group, Inc.. (Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Global Refining Group, Inc.. (Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Global Refining Group, Inc..(Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franklin Powers on behalf of Global Refining Group, Inc. (Powers, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re: #4 Affidavit of Service; Clerk spoke with filing attorney in regards to the service date. The correct event is "Summons Returned Executed" which will generate an answer due date of March 30, 2021. Clerk will correct the docket text and set the answer due date. No further action is required at this time. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Returned Executed on Global Refining Group, Inc. c/o Robert E. Hawthorne, Jr., Registered Agent on March 9, 2021, filed by Robert Turcotte. (Doner, Karen). Answer due date: March 30, 2021. Modified to correct docket text on 3/12/2021. (sbea,) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Global Refining Group, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Robert Turcotte. (Doner, Karen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7655015.), filed by Robert Turcotte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Doner, Karen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 11/5/2021.] (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Evan Lewis