This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2022 at 07:38:07 (UTC).

Tucson Medical Center v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Tucson Medical Center filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45008

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tucson Medical Center

Defendants

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Noramco Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Watson Laboratories Incorporated

Actavis LLC

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Anda Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth S. Smith

Attorney at Motley Rice - Washington

401 Ninth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

John W Don Barrett

Attorney at Don Barrett PA

P.O. Box 987

Lexington, MS 39095

Linda J. Singer

Attorney at Motley Rice - Washington

401 Ninth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Samuel F. Mitchell

Attorney at Ste. 5009

7161 East Rancho Vista Drive

Scottsdale, AZ 80112

Steven C Mitchell

Attorney at Mitchell & Speights LLC

4854 E Baseline Rd., Ste. 103

Mesa, AZ 85206

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#16

(#16) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#15

(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

5 #13

Summons

5 #12

Summons

5 #10

Summons

5 #4

Summons

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20252100. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00024-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 1/25/2022, answer due 3/28/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/2/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/25/2022 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Samuel) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona. Case number 4:22-cv-00024. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-213) Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio Re MDL-2804. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorneys Elizabeth Smith, Linda Singer, John W (Don) Barrett, and Samuel Mitchell terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCopy of document number [4, 5, 6] mailed to Elizabeth Smith, Linda Singer on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Tucson Medical Center. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type; Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Title Page does not include filing attorney information in upper left corner. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Incorporated, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Incorporated, Cardinal Health Incorporated, Cephalon Incorporated, Endo Health Solutions Incorporated, Endo Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceutica Incorporated, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Johnson & Johnson, Noramco Incorporated, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Incorporated, Watson Laboratories Incorporated, Watson Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20252100. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maria S Aguilera. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00024-TUC-MSA. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-20252100 filed by Tucson Medical Center. (Mitchell, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) [Transferred from azd on 2/4/2022.] (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tucson Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant