This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2020 at 08:03:56 (UTC).

Tucker v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 Tucker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerald Tucker

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy M. Bechtold

Attorney at BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Po Box 7051

Missoula, MT 59807-7051

Defendant Attorneys

Randy J. Tanner

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

Mark Steger Smith

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - BILLINGS

2601 Second Avenue North, Suite 3200

Billings, MT 59101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Timothy M. Bechtold, Mark Steger Smith. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/28/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

2 #2

Issued Summons_Departement of Interior

2 #1

Issued Summons_Barr

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons_Barr, #2 Issued Summons_Departement of Interior) (MMS) (Originals e-mailed to counsel) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #4

Blank Summons_Department of Interior

1 #3

Blank Summons_Barr

1 #2

Blank Summons_USA

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Emerald Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons_USA, #3 Blank Summons_Barr, #4 Blank Summons_Department of Interior) (MMS) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct file date (MMS). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Timothy M. Bechtold, Mark Steger Smith. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 12/28/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons_Barr, #2 Issued Summons_Departement of Interior) (MMS) (Originals e-mailed to counsel) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2556741 (MMS) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Emerald Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons_USA, #3 Blank Summons_Barr, #4 Blank Summons_Department of Interior) (MMS) Modified on 10/13/2020 to correct file date (MMS). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less