This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2019 at 08:56:40 (UTC).

Tucker v. United States Court of Appeals for Tenth Circuit et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 Tucker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Court of Appeals for Tenth Circuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Markeith D. Tucker

Elk City, OK 73644

Defendants

United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

United States Court of Appeals for Tenth Circuit

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against United States Court of Appeals for Tenth Circuit, United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma by Markeith D. Tucker (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Markeith D. Tucker (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Markeith D. Tucker. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Additionally, this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Additionally, this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Markeith D. Tucker. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against United States Court of Appeals for Tenth Circuit, United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma by Markeith D. Tucker (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Markeith D. Tucker (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.