This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 07:46:00 (UTC).

Tucker v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Tucker filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Greyhound Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and George C. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00505

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

George C. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre R. Tucker

Hilliard, OH 43026

Defendants

Jane Doe

Greyhound Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David J Fagnilli

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin PC

127 Public Square, Suite 3510

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Greyhound Lines, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 26, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint New date requested 4/29/2019. by Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Greyhound Lines, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (er) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. (jlk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 19, 2019. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jane Doe, Greyhound Lines, Inc., filed by Andre R. Tucker. (jlk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #4

Marshal forms

1 #3

Summonses to be issued

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Andre R. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summonses to be issued, #4 Marshal forms) (er) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Greyhound Lines, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 26, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint New date requested 4/29/2019. by Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fagnilli, David) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Greyhound Lines, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (er) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Greyhound Lines, Inc. (jlk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 19, 2019. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jane Doe, Greyhound Lines, Inc., filed by Andre R. Tucker. (jlk) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Andre R. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summonses to be issued, #4 Marshal forms) (er) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.