This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 11:52:42 (UTC).

Tucker v. City of Princeton, West Virginia et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Tucker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Princeton, West Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Faber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00227

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Faber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Lori Tucker

Defendants

City of Princeton, West Virginia

Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia Beavers

Attorney at BEAVERS LAW FIRM

4137 Coal Heritage Road

Bluefield, WV 24701

Defendant Attorney

Gordon H. Copland

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

400 White Oaks Boulevard

Bridgeport, WV 26330

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Amended Complaint

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Summons: Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.

#3

2 #1

Summons Submitted - Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.

#2

1 #3

Receipt - Civil Filing Fee

1 #2

Cover Letter

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Lori Tucker to Amend #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Complaint) (lca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint to July 9, 2019 by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., Lori tucker, City of Princeton, West Virginia (Copland, Gordon) (Modified on 6/22/2019 to add party filers) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint to June 21, 2019 by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., City of Princeton, Lori Tucker (Copland, Gordon) (Modified on 5/8/2019 to add party filers) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint to May 13, 2019 by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., City of Princeton, West Virginia, Lori Tucker (Copland, Gordon) (Modified on 4/19/2019 to add party filers)(ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for City of Princeton, West Virginia, re: #3 Summons Issued by Clerk. City of Princeton, West Virginia served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY CERTIFIED MAIL for Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., re: #3 Summons Issued by Clerk. Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Dr. Lori Tucker, D.O. for City of Princeton, West Virginia, Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., via cert. mail, RRR-RD, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. (Attachment: #1 Summons: Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONSES SUBMITTED by Lori Tucker, D.O. for City of Princeton, West Virginia, Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Summons: Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 1BLUE001539. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter Requesting Service of Process, #3 Receipt - Civil Filing Fee) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Princeton Community Hospital is a litigant