This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 07:35:02 (UTC).

Tucker v. AD Practitioners LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Tucker filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AD Practitioners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01347

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendall Hope Tucker

Defendants

AD Practitioners LLC

Greg Powel

Ian Robertson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roberto Buso-Aboy

Harmeet K. Dhillon

John-Paul S. Deol

 

Court Documents

12 #3

Summons Ian Robertson

12 #2

Summons Greg Powel

12 #1

Summons AD Practitioners LLC

#12

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Summons

#5

#3

2 #6

Summons Ian Robertson

2 #5

Summons Gregory Powel

2 #3

Category Sheet

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER noted #12 Informative motion. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 9/21/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process filed by Roberto Buso-Aboy on behalf of Kendall Hope Tucker Responses due by 10/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons AD Practitioners LLC, #2 Summons Greg Powel, #3 Summons Ian Robertson)(Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear PHV. John-Paul S. Deol admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 8/18/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear PHV. Harmeet Dhillon admitted PHV. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 8/18/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AD Practitioners LLC, Greg Powel, Ian Robertson, filed by Kendall Hope Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to allow John-Paul S Deol to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7415581) filed by Roberto Buso-Aboy on behalf of Kendall Hope Tucker Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to allow Harmeet Dhillon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7415521) filed by Roberto Buso-Aboy on behalf of Kendall Hope Tucker Responses due by 8/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Having reviewed the Complaint's jurisdictional averments, the Court finds them to be defective. Plaintiff is granted until August 16, 2021 to amend her complaint for the purpose of specifically averring, as of the date of commencement of this action: (a) the identity and citizenship for jurisdictional purposes of each of the members of AD Practitioner, LLC; and (b) codefendants Greg Powell and Ian Robertson's domiciles. Signed by Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 7/30/2021. (mrr) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to AD Practitioners LLC, Greg Powel, Ian Robertson (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach (arg) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Buso-Aboy on behalf of Kendall Hope Tucker (Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against AD Practitioners LLC, Greg Powel, Ian Robertson, filed by Kendall Hope Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons AD Practitioners LLC, #5 Summons Gregory Powel, #6 Summons Ian Robertson)(Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7393675.), filed by Kendall Hope Tucker. Service due by 10/27/2021, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buso-Aboy, Roberto) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less